Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 41 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 41 Week
» 7653 Month
» 74515 Year
» 1739891 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 479 m/e 06/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3479   05/04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3924   16/06/1946
British Railways 63924 w/e 06/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O206/1921
O2/4 (2-8-0)02/10/1943
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L742
Works Number 22693
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service During 06/1921 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Sun 03/11/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Service Life 42 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1964 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
NWE   New England (New) m/e 06/1921
DON   Doncaster on 13/05/1943
CLK   Colwick on 23/01/1944
NWE   New England on 21/09/1944
CLK   Colwick on 25/06/1945
DON   Doncaster on 09/12/1945
LNG   Langwith Junction on 27/10/1946
36B   Mexborough on 18/06/1950
36B   Mexborough m/e 30/06/1950
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 14/09/1952
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 04/10/1952
     Withdrawn on 03/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 36B Mexborough m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 04/10/1952
WDN   on 03/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1921 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7503)
19/07/1930 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7524)
06/04/1935 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8820)
02/10/1943 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9435)
31/07/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28156)
23/04/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28111)
27/05/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28436)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Doncaster Works 14/11/1923 05/04/1924 144 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3479
 
Doncaster Works 10/01/1925 09/02/1925 31 days Light Repair    
Doncaster Works 12/07/1926 18/11/1926 130 days General    
Doncaster Works 03/08/1928 05/10/1928 64 days General    
Doncaster Works 07/06/1930 19/07/1930 43 days General Boiler number 7524 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 21/01/1933 18/02/1933 29 days General    
Doncaster Works 30/09/1933 14/10/1933 15 days Light Repair    
Doncaster Works 16/03/1935 06/04/1935 22 days General Boiler number 8820 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 27/03/1937 17/04/1937 22 days General    
Doncaster Works 01/07/1939 05/08/1939 36 days General SW Cab fitted
 
Doncaster Works 03/05/1941 14/06/1941 43 days General    
Doncaster Works 17/07/1943 02/10/1943 78 days General Rebuilt to class O2/4
Boiler number 9435 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 21/04/1945 28/04/1945 8 days Light Repair    
Doncaster Works 31/08/1946 05/10/1946 36 days General    
Doncaster Works 08/10/1948 05/11/1948 29 days General Renumbered to BR 63924
 
Doncaster Works 03/07/1951 31/07/1951 29 days General Boiler number 28156 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 25/03/1954 23/04/1954 30 days General Boiler number 28111 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 28/06/1956 04/08/1956 38 days General    
Doncaster Works 25/04/1959 27/05/1959 33 days General Boiler number 28436 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 15/10/1959 24/10/1959 10 days Unclassified    
Doncaster Works 29/12/1961 31/01/1962 34 days General    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/01/1962 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: D3453, E3088-94. Outside Erecting Shop: 60817, 61375, 61861/99, 63858, 68900, 70003/7. Erecting Shop: D2406, D3289, 13336, D3487, D5522/47/95, D5822. D8021, 08213, D9012, 12133, 43032, 60025/47/61/87, 60134, 60854, 61051, 61223/52, 61374, 62013, 63924/38, 70006, 76046. Stripping Road-dept. 10/1: 60938, 62034, 63571. Outside Crimpsal: D3482. 70018. Crimpsal: 60014/43/63/83/97. Outside Weighshop: 60138/57. Paint Shop: D374 (BE 3120 VF D670 of 1961), D5369 (BRCW DEL 212 of 1961), D5644, D5828 (Brush 364 of 1961), D5830 (Brush 366 of 1961), E3086/7, 60027/84 an 60125. SLS/196202
28/01/1962 Doncaster Works (Outside Weigh House) New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1921 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 479
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22693
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
14/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1923. Dep: 05/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3479
   
10/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/01/1925. Dep: 09/02/1925.    
12/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1926. Dep: 18/11/1926.    
03/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1928. Dep: 05/10/1928.    
07/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1930. Dep: 19/07/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7524 (Diagram 2)
   
21/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1933. Dep: 18/02/1933.    
30/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/09/1933. Dep: 14/10/1933.    
16/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1935. Dep: 06/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8820 (Diagram 2)
   
27/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1937. Dep: 17/04/1937.    
01/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1939. Dep: 05/08/1939.
Work undertaken:
SW Cab fitted
   
03/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1941. Dep: 14/06/1941.    
13/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
17/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1943. Dep: 02/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O2/4
Boiler number 9435 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
21/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
21/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/04/1945. Dep: 28/04/1945.    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
16/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3924    
31/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1946. Dep: 05/10/1946.    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
08/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1948. Dep: 05/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63924
   
18/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
30/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
03/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1951. Dep: 31/07/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28156 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
25/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1954. Dep: 23/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28111 (Diagram 100A)
   
28/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1956. Dep: 04/08/1956.    
25/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1959. Dep: 27/05/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28436 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/10/1959. Dep: 24/10/1959.    
29/12/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1961. Dep: 31/01/1962.    
03/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63924 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
01/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev