|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1923 | 05/04/1924 | 144 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3479 |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/01/1925 | 09/02/1925 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/07/1926 | 18/11/1926 | 130 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/08/1928 | 05/10/1928 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/06/1930 | 19/07/1930 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 7524 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/01/1933 | 18/02/1933 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1933 | 14/10/1933 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1935 | 06/04/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 8820 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1937 | 17/04/1937 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1939 | 05/08/1939 | 36 days | General | SW Cab fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1941 | 14/06/1941 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1943 | 02/10/1943 | 78 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 9435 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1945 | 28/04/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1946 | 05/10/1946 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1948 | 05/11/1948 | 29 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63924 |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1951 | 31/07/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28156 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1954 | 23/04/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28111 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/06/1956 | 04/08/1956 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1959 | 27/05/1959 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28436 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1959 | 24/10/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1961 | 31/01/1962 | 34 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3453, E3088-94. Outside Erecting Shop: 60817, 61375, 61861/99, 63858, 68900, 70003/7. Erecting Shop: D2406, D3289, 13336, D3487, D5522/47/95, D5822. D8021, 08213, D9012, 12133, 43032, 60025/47/61/87, 60134, 60854, 61051, 61223/52, 61374, 62013, 63924/38, 70006, 76046. Stripping Road-dept. 10/1: 60938, 62034, 63571. Outside Crimpsal: D3482. 70018. Crimpsal: 60014/43/63/83/97. Outside Weighshop: 60138/57. Paint Shop: D374 (BE 3120 VF D670 of 1961), D5369 (BRCW DEL 212 of 1961), D5644, D5828 (Brush 364 of 1961), D5830 (Brush 366 of 1961), E3086/7, 60027/84 an 60125. | SLS/196202 |
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Outside Weigh House) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 479 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22693 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
14/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1923. Dep: 05/04/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3479 |
||
10/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/01/1925. Dep: 09/02/1925. | ||
12/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1926. Dep: 18/11/1926. | ||
03/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1928. Dep: 05/10/1928. | ||
07/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1930. Dep: 19/07/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7524 (Diagram 2) |
||
21/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1933. Dep: 18/02/1933. | ||
30/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/09/1933. Dep: 14/10/1933. | ||
16/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1935. Dep: 06/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8820 (Diagram 2) |
||
27/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1937. Dep: 17/04/1937. | ||
01/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1939. Dep: 05/08/1939. Work undertaken: SW Cab fitted |
||
03/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1941. Dep: 14/06/1941. | ||
13/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
17/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1943. Dep: 02/10/1943. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 9435 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
21/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
21/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/04/1945. Dep: 28/04/1945. | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
09/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
16/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3924 | ||
31/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1946. Dep: 05/10/1946. | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
08/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1948. Dep: 05/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63924 |
||
18/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
03/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1951. Dep: 31/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28156 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
25/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1954. Dep: 23/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28111 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1956. Dep: 04/08/1956. | ||
25/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1959. Dep: 27/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28436 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/10/1959. Dep: 24/10/1959. | ||
29/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1961. Dep: 31/01/1962. | ||
03/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63924 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |