|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 12/07/1921 | 16/07/1921 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1923 | 29/01/1923 | 1 day | Unclassified | Specimen L&NER painting |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1923 | 27/11/1923 | 91 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 484N |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1926 | 19/05/1926 | 99 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1928 | 17/08/1928 | 82 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/09/1930 | 18/10/1930 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 7507 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1932 | 26/03/1932 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1934 | 05/05/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7710 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/04/1936 | 16/05/1936 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/05/1938 | 13/08/1938 | 85 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1940 | 10/08/1940 | 29 days | General | SW cab fitted Boiler number 9241 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/06/1942 | 25/07/1942 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1944 | 09/09/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1946 | 31/08/1946 | 22 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3929 |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1947 | 03/12/1947 | 23 days | Heavy | Boiler number 8458 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1948 | 15/11/1948 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 9389 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63929 |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1951 | 08/05/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 21022 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1954 | 15/06/1954 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 21047 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1956 | 28/07/1956 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/06/1959 | 10/07/1959 | 38 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28957 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1960 | 01/09/1960 | 14 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 484 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22698 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
12/07/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/07/1921. Dep: 16/07/1921. | ||
29/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/01/1923. Dep: 29/01/1923. Work undertaken: Specimen L&NER painting |
||
29/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1923. Dep: 27/11/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 484N |
||
01/1926 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3484 | ||
10/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1926. Dep: 19/05/1926. | ||
28/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1928. Dep: 17/08/1928. | ||
06/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1930. Dep: 18/10/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7507 (Diagram 2) |
||
20/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1932. Dep: 26/03/1932. | ||
07/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1934. Dep: 05/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7710 (Diagram 2) |
||
18/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936. | ||
21/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 13/08/1938. | ||
13/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1940. Dep: 10/08/1940. Work undertaken: SW cab fitted Boiler number 9241 (Diagram 2) |
||
27/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1942. Dep: 25/07/1942. | ||
06/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
12/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1944. Dep: 09/09/1944. | ||
17/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
10/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3929 |
||
11/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/11/1947. Dep: 03/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8458 (Diagram 2) |
||
15/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1948. Dep: 15/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9389 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63929 |
||
08/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1951. Dep: 08/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21022 (Diagram 2) |
||
19/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1954. Dep: 15/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21047 (Diagram 2) |
||
19/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1956. Dep: 28/07/1956. | ||
03/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1959. Dep: 10/07/1959. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28957 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/08/1960. Dep: 01/09/1960. | ||
07/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
09/07/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63929 from Grantham (34F) |