|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1925 | 06/03/1926 | 94 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3488 |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/12/1927 | 08/03/1928 | 86 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1930 | 08/03/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/07/1932 | 27/08/1932 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7711 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/07/1934 | 25/08/1934 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1936 | 15/08/1936 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/08/1938 | 01/10/1938 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 8186 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1940 | 31/08/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7707 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/09/1942 | 10/10/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 9015 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1942 | 19/12/1942 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/10/1944 | 04/11/1944 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 4406 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1946 | 01/06/1946 | 36 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3933 |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1948 | 23/08/1948 | 38 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63933 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1951 | 14/02/1951 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 21014 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1953 | 22/05/1953 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 21067 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1955 | 04/04/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 21010 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/10/1956 | 02/11/1956 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/12/1957 | 25/01/1958 | 35 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1961 | 10/02/1961 | 38 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/11/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 488 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1575 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
03/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1925. Dep: 06/03/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3488 |
||
14/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1927. Dep: 08/03/1928. | ||
01/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1930. Dep: 08/03/1930. | ||
23/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1932. Dep: 27/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7711 (Diagram 2) |
||
28/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1934. Dep: 25/08/1934. | ||
18/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1936. Dep: 15/08/1936. | ||
17/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1938. Dep: 01/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8186 (Diagram 2) |
||
27/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1940. Dep: 31/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7707 (Diagram 2) |
||
12/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9015 (Diagram 2) |
||
12/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/12/1942. Dep: 19/12/1942. | ||
07/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
07/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1944. Dep: 04/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4406 (Diagram 2) |
||
17/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
27/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3933 |
||
17/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1948. Dep: 23/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63933 |
||
09/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
29/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
18/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1951. Dep: 14/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21014 (Diagram 2) |
||
16/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
22/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
28/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
03/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
28/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1953. Dep: 22/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21067 (Diagram 2) |
||
06/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1955. Dep: 04/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21010 (Diagram 2) |
||
09/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/10/1956. Dep: 02/11/1956. | ||
22/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1957. Dep: 25/01/1958. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 |
||
04/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1961. Dep: 10/02/1961. | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63933 from Grantham (34F) | ||
12/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |