|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 06/08/1926 | 27/11/1926 | 114 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1928 | 09/02/1929 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1931 | 06/06/1931 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1932 | 28/05/1932 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1933 | 18/11/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7509 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1935 | 17/08/1935 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1937 | 28/08/1937 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1939 | 07/10/1939 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 8457 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/08/1941 | 06/09/1941 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 9244 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/11/1943 | 04/12/1943 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/08/1946 | 07/09/1946 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1948 | 23/11/1948 | 14 days | General | Boiler number 9321 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63941 |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1951 | 17/08/1951 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 21032 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1955 | 13/04/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 21067 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1956 | 11/04/1956 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1961 | 09/02/1961 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 21054 (Diagram 2) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Stored) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/02/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3496 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1584 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
01/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
06/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1926. Dep: 27/11/1926. | ||
08/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1928. Dep: 09/02/1929. | ||
25/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1931. Dep: 06/06/1931. | ||
07/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/05/1932. Dep: 28/05/1932. | ||
14/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1933. Dep: 18/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7509 (Diagram 2) |
||
20/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1935. Dep: 17/08/1935. | ||
07/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1937. Dep: 28/08/1937. | ||
26/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8457 (Diagram 2) |
||
02/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1941. Dep: 06/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9244 (Diagram 2) |
||
13/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1943. Dep: 04/12/1943. | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
17/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946. | ||
07/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3941 | ||
09/02/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
10/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1948. Dep: 23/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9321 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63941 |
||
12/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
18/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1951. Dep: 17/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21032 (Diagram 2) |
||
15/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1955. Dep: 13/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21067 (Diagram 2) |
||
15/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1956. Dep: 11/04/1956. | ||
07/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1961. Dep: 09/02/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21054 (Diagram 2) |
||
26/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
03/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63941 from Grantham (34F) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |