Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1059 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 4762 Week
» 3500 Month
» 417821 Year
» 1639386 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3498 on 29/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3943   17/08/1946
British Railways 63943 w/e 26/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1589
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Sun 29/03/1924 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Sun 22/09/1963 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 39 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) on 29/03/1924
DON Doncaster on 12/12/1943
CLK Colwick on 23/01/1944
NWE New England on 24/09/1944
DON Doncaster on 20/11/1945
LNG Langwith Junction on 27/10/1946
36A Doncaster on 25/06/1950
34F Grantham on 27/11/1960
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 11/06/1961
34F Grantham on 16/07/1961
36A Doncaster on 08/09/1963
   Withdrawn on 22/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 36A Doncaster m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 34F Grantham 5w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 34F Grantham 4w/e 05/08/1961
WDN   on 22/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
29/03/1924 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7712)
04/11/1933 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8185)
28/08/1937 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7691)
26/12/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8859)
17/08/1946 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8976)
24/06/1948 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8821)
29/09/1950 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21001)
23/02/1954 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21018)
01/06/1957 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21045)
26/05/1962 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21061)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 09/08/1926 11/12/1926 125 days General  
Doncaster Works 19/01/1929 02/03/1929 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/04/1931 30/05/1931 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 07/10/1933 04/11/1933 29 days General
Boiler number 8185 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 13/07/1935 10/08/1935 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 07/08/1937 28/08/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 7691 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 09/10/1937 09/10/1937 1 day Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 28/10/1939 25/11/1939 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 02/12/1939 09/12/1939 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 20/07/1940 31/08/1940 43 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 09/11/1940 28/12/1940 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/03/1941 19/04/1941 22 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 31/10/1942 26/12/1942 57 days General
Boiler number 8859 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 09/12/1944 06/01/1945 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 20/07/1946 17/08/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 8976 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3943
 
Doncaster Works 22/05/1948 24/06/1948 34 days General
Boiler number 8821 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63943
 
Doncaster Works 24/08/1950 29/09/1950 37 days General
Boiler number 21001 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 20/01/1952 29/02/1952 41 days Heavy Casual  
Doncaster Works 19/01/1954 23/02/1954 36 days General
Boiler number 21018 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 26/04/1957 01/06/1957 37 days General
Boiler number 21045 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 07/02/1961 22/02/1961 16 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 13/04/1962 26/05/1962 44 days General
Boiler number 21061 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 19/03/1963 29/03/1963 11 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302
04/01/1959 Doncaster MPD (Stored) On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). SLS/195902
19/02/1961 Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/03/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3498
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1589
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
12/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
24/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
20/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
27/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (34F)    
11/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
16/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (34F)    
08/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
22/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63943 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev