|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1926 | 11/12/1926 | 125 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1929 | 02/03/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1931 | 30/05/1931 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/10/1933 | 04/11/1933 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 8185 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1935 | 10/08/1935 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1937 | 28/08/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 7691 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/10/1937 | 09/10/1937 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1939 | 25/11/1939 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1939 | 09/12/1939 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1940 | 31/08/1940 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1940 | 28/12/1940 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1941 | 19/04/1941 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/10/1942 | 26/12/1942 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 8859 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1944 | 06/01/1945 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1946 | 17/08/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 8976 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3943 |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/05/1948 | 24/06/1948 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 8821 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63943 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1950 | 29/09/1950 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 21001 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1952 | 29/02/1952 | 41 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1954 | 23/02/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21018 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1957 | 01/06/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 21045 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1961 | 22/02/1961 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1962 | 26/05/1962 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 21061 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1963 | 29/03/1963 | 11 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Stored) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/03/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3498 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1589 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
09/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1926. Dep: 11/12/1926. | ||
19/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1929. Dep: 02/03/1929. | ||
25/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1931. Dep: 30/05/1931. | ||
07/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1933. Dep: 04/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8185 (Diagram 2) |
||
13/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1935. Dep: 10/08/1935. | ||
07/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1937. Dep: 28/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7691 (Diagram 2) |
||
09/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/10/1937. Dep: 09/10/1937. | ||
28/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 25/11/1939. | ||
02/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/12/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939. | ||
20/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/07/1940. Dep: 31/08/1940. | ||
09/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1940. Dep: 28/12/1940. | ||
29/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/03/1941. Dep: 19/04/1941. | ||
31/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1942. Dep: 26/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8859 (Diagram 2) |
||
12/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
24/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
09/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1944. Dep: 06/01/1945. | ||
20/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
20/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8976 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3943 |
||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
22/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1948. Dep: 24/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8821 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63943 |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
24/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1950. Dep: 29/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21001 (Diagram 2) |
||
20/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/01/1952. Dep: 29/02/1952. | ||
19/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1954. Dep: 23/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21018 (Diagram 2) |
||
26/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1957. Dep: 01/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21045 (Diagram 2) |
||
27/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
07/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/02/1961. Dep: 22/02/1961. | ||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
16/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
13/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1962. Dep: 26/05/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21061 (Diagram 2) |
||
19/03/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/03/1963. Dep: 29/03/1963. | ||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63943 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |