|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1925 | 20/06/1925 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1927 | 01/11/1927 | 76 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1928 | 24/02/1928 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/11/1929 | 14/12/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1932 | 28/05/1932 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7719 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/07/1934 | 25/08/1934 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1936 | 04/07/1936 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/07/1938 | 23/07/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 7510 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/09/1940 | 26/10/1940 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 9245 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1943 | 20/03/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1944 | 25/12/1944 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1946 | 30/03/1946 | 29 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3946 |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1948 | 13/02/1948 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 8459 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3946 |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1949 | 09/05/1949 | 35 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 9014 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63946 |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/07/1949 | 03/08/1949 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/09/1950 | 24/10/1950 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 21003 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/06/1952 | 25/07/1952 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 21053 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1954 | 23/11/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 21052 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1957 | 05/12/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 21044 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/01/1959 | 14/02/1959 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1960 | 01/10/1960 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 21004 (Diagram 2) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/06/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3501 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1595 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
28/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
15/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/05/1925. Dep: 20/06/1925. | ||
18/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1927. Dep: 01/11/1927. | ||
17/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/01/1928. Dep: 24/02/1928. | ||
16/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929. | ||
23/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1932. Dep: 28/05/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7719 (Diagram 2) |
||
14/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1934. Dep: 25/08/1934. | ||
13/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1936. Dep: 04/07/1936. | ||
02/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1938. Dep: 23/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7510 (Diagram 2) |
||
14/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1940. Dep: 26/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9245 (Diagram 2) |
||
20/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943. | ||
25/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 25/12/1944. | ||
11/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
02/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1946. Dep: 30/03/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3946 |
||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
17/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1948. Dep: 13/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8459 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3946 |
||
05/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/04/1949. Dep: 09/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9014 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63946 |
||
15/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/07/1949. Dep: 03/08/1949. | ||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
26/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1950. Dep: 24/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21003 (Diagram 2) |
||
18/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1952. Dep: 25/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21053 (Diagram 2) |
||
05/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
25/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1954. Dep: 23/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21052 (Diagram 2) |
||
06/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1957. Dep: 05/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21044 (Diagram 2) |
||
26/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/01/1959. Dep: 14/02/1959. | ||
19/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1960. Dep: 01/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21004 (Diagram 2) |
||
16/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
07/04/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63946 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |