|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1934 | 31/10/1934 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1936 | 02/10/1936 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 8458 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1937 | 29/10/1937 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/02/1939 | 04/03/1939 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1940 | 07/12/1940 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1942 | 21/11/1942 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 4408 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1944 | 14/10/1944 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1945 | 09/06/1945 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1947 | 04/04/1947 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/09/1947 | 17/11/1947 | 77 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/07/1949 | 12/08/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 9470 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63951 |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1951 | 24/07/1951 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21029 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1953 | 21/11/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 21007 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/12/1955 | 28/01/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21020 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/07/1958 | 02/09/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21007 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1962 | 12/06/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
31/05/1950 | Unreported renumberings | The following locos have been reported as renumberd by observations, but whose changes have not been notified by the Eastern and North Eastern regions: 69353, 69674, 69719, 63719, 63951/4/5/6, an 69012/3; the latter pair of 'J.72's' were delivered in the 60000 series! | SLS/195007 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/07/1932 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2958 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1777 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
18/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1934. Dep: 31/10/1934. | ||
18/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1936. Dep: 02/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8458 (Diagram 2) |
||
30/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1937. Dep: 29/10/1937. | ||
04/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1939. Dep: 04/03/1939. | ||
09/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1940. Dep: 07/12/1940. | ||
17/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1942. Dep: 21/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4408 (Diagram 2) |
||
23/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1944. Dep: 14/10/1944. | ||
28/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/04/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945. | ||
17/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3951 | ||
24/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1947. Dep: 04/04/1947. | ||
02/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/09/1947. Dep: 17/11/1947. | ||
10/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1949. Dep: 12/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9470 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63951 |
||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
19/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1951. Dep: 24/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21029 (Diagram 2) |
||
22/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1953. Dep: 21/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21007 (Diagram 2) |
||
24/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1955. Dep: 28/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21020 (Diagram 2) |
||
29/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1958. Dep: 02/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21007 (Diagram 2) |
||
16/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
12/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 12/06/1962. Dep: 12/06/1962. | ||
25/06/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63951 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
07/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |