|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1935 | 21/08/1935 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1937 | 07/1937 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1938 | 10/12/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 9160 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1939 | 13/01/1940 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/11/1941 | 03/01/1942 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 7692 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1943 | 02/10/1943 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 9012 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1945 | 26/05/1945 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1946 | 25/05/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 9362 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3955 |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1946 | 28/11/1946 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1948 | 07/06/1948 | 36 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63955 |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1950 | 16/03/1950 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 9399 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/09/1951 | 16/10/1951 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 21037 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/09/1953 | 09/10/1953 | 26 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1955 | 10/11/1955 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 21062 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1959 | 03/04/1959 | 39 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28300 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1962 | 26/04/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1950 | Unreported renumberings | The following locos have been reported as renumberd by observations, but whose changes have not been notified by the Eastern and North Eastern regions: 69353, 69674, 69719, 63719, 63951/4/5/6, an 69012/3; the latter pair of 'J.72's' were delivered in the 60000 series! | SLS/195007 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/11/1933 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2430 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1781 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
18/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1935. Dep: 21/08/1935. | ||
09/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1937. Dep: ?/07/1937. | ||
12/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1938. Dep: 10/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9160 (Diagram 2) |
||
18/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1939. Dep: 13/01/1940. | ||
22/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1941. Dep: 03/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7692 (Diagram 2) |
||
21/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1943. Dep: 02/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9012 (Diagram 2) |
||
28/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/04/1945. Dep: 26/05/1945. | ||
20/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1946. Dep: 25/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9362 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3955 |
||
07/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/11/1946. Dep: 28/11/1946. | ||
03/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1948. Dep: 07/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63955 |
||
31/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1950. Dep: 16/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9399 (Diagram 2) |
||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
03/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1951. Dep: 16/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21037 (Diagram 2) |
||
14/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1953. Dep: 09/10/1953. | ||
18/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1955. Dep: 10/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21062 (Diagram 2) |
||
24/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1959. Dep: 03/04/1959. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28300 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
26/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 26/04/1962. Dep: 26/04/1962. | ||
05/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
07/05/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63955 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |