|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1935 | 29/08/1935 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1937 | 11/06/1937 | 48 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1938 | 05/11/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 8460 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/06/1939 | 22/07/1939 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 4405 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1941 | 15/03/1941 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1942 | 22/08/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7710 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/06/1944 | 24/06/1944 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1946 | 23/03/1946 | 29 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3957 |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/05/1948 | 25/06/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 9462 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63957 |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1950 | 02/08/1950 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 9385 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1951 | 22/06/1951 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1953 | 04/02/1953 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 21063 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1955 | 26/11/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21037 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1958 | 15/03/1958 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 21000 (Diagram 2) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Stored) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
11/08/1959 | Doncaster Works | Paint shop- D223, D2066, D2265, D3060, 60075/511, 61825, 73010/165; Weigh-house- D224, D2065, 60006, 61211, 62054, 63934; New Erecting shop- D2067/8/9, E5010-4, D3070, D3137/49, D3230/2/3I; Crimpsall shops-No. 2 Bay- 12113, 13254, D3072, 61185, 61809/62/73/903/27, 63930/48, 68904/65; Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay- 60016/20/77/90/4/129/50/536; 61210, 62057 an 63957 on south side with Service loco 4; Stripping-60038/82, 61813/39, 63965, 70000, 73163/6. Awaiting cut up- 61661, 64181/258, 68973, 69515/7/45/8/76/84; Being cut up-60700, 61627, 64246, 69536/9. For condition reports- 61623, 68974, 69526/41/91. In yard D3229 an 11160. | SLS/195909 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/12/1933 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2432 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1783 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
18/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1935. Dep: 29/08/1935. | ||
25/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1937. Dep: 11/06/1937. | ||
15/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8460 (Diagram 2) |
||
24/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1939. Dep: 22/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4405 (Diagram 2) |
||
15/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1941. Dep: 15/03/1941. | ||
25/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1942. Dep: 22/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7710 (Diagram 2) |
||
03/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944. | ||
23/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1946. Dep: 23/03/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3957 |
||
26/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1948. Dep: 25/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9462 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63957 |
||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
06/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1950. Dep: 02/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9385 (Diagram 2) |
||
13/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/06/1951. Dep: 22/06/1951. | ||
08/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1953. Dep: 04/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21063 (Diagram 2) |
||
22/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1955. Dep: 26/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21037 (Diagram 2) |
||
06/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1958. Dep: 15/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21000 (Diagram 2) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
07/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
04/07/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63957 from Grantham (34F) |