Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1043 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 4746 Week
» 3484 Month
» 417805 Year
» 1639370 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2436 on 20/02/1934
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3961   06/10/1946
British Railways 63961 w/e 19/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O2/420/02/1934
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1787
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Sat 20/02/1934 to March (MAR)
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 09/1963 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)
Service Life 28 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March (New) on 20/02/1934
36A Doncaster on 25/06/1950
36C Frodingham on 12/04/1953
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 03/01/1954
   Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PTH Perth (LNER) w/e 10/01/1948
ALLOC 36A Doncaster m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 23/01/1954
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
20/02/1934 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 4402)
14/08/1937 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9014)
19/09/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8457)
06/07/1946 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9012)
27/01/1950 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9240)
02/07/1952 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21052)
11/11/1954 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21028)
14/06/1957 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21018)
07/03/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28199)
23/02/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28394)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 16/08/1935 25/09/1935 41 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/12/1935 22/02/1936 61 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 11/07/1937 14/08/1937 35 days General
Boiler number 9014 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 16/10/1937 02/11/1937 18 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 22/04/1939 27/05/1939 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 01/02/1941 01/03/1941 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/08/1942 19/09/1942 22 days General
Boiler number 8457 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 15/07/1944 05/08/1944 22 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/05/1946 06/07/1946 50 days General
Boiler number 9012 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 24/05/1948 18/06/1948 26 days General
Renumbered to BR 63961
 
Doncaster Works 10/09/1949 04/10/1949 25 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 31/12/1949 27/01/1950 28 days General
Boiler number 9240 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 28/05/1952 02/07/1952 36 days General
Boiler number 21052 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 12/10/1954 11/11/1954 31 days General
Boiler number 21028 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 02/05/1957 14/06/1957 44 days General
Boiler number 21018 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 11/02/1959 07/03/1959 25 days Heavy Casual
Rebuilt to class O2/4
Boiler number 28199 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 23/01/1960 23/02/1960 32 days General
Boiler number 28394 (Diagram 100A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/06/1948 Cowlairs Works (yard) Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. SLS/194808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/02/1934 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2436
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1787
Allocated to March (MAR)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
06/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3961    
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
12/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
03/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63961 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev