|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1935 | 30/09/1935 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/06/1937 | 31/07/1937 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1939 | 04/02/1939 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 4406 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1940 | 24/08/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1942 | 16/05/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1943 | 19/06/1943 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/05/1944 | 27/05/1944 | 22 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 9437 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/09/1945 | 22/09/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1946 | 08/06/1946 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/10/1947 | 20/11/1947 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1947 | 19/12/1947 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1948 | 24/03/1948 | 22 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63962 |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1949 | 19/01/1950 | 32 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 8820 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1952 | 01/09/1952 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 21056 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1952 | 22/01/1953 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1953 | 11/03/1953 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1955 | 28/04/1955 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 21066 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1957 | 29/11/1957 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 21061 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1962 | 17/02/1962 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 21047 (Diagram 2) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/03/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2437 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1788 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
22/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1935. Dep: 30/09/1935. | ||
27/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
04/01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
27/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1937. Dep: 31/07/1937. | ||
07/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1939. Dep: 04/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4406 (Diagram 2) |
||
20/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1940. Dep: 24/08/1940. | ||
04/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1942. Dep: 16/05/1942. | ||
15/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/05/1943. Dep: 19/06/1943. | ||
06/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1944. Dep: 27/05/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 9437 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/09/1945. Dep: 22/09/1945. | ||
11/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1946. Dep: 08/06/1946. | ||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3962 | ||
07/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1947. Dep: 20/11/1947. | ||
03/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/12/1947. Dep: 19/12/1947. | ||
03/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/03/1948. Dep: 24/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63962 |
||
19/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1949. Dep: 19/01/1950. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 8820 (Diagram 2) |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
05/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1952. Dep: 01/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21056 (Diagram 2) |
||
29/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/12/1952. Dep: 22/01/1953. | ||
24/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1953. Dep: 11/03/1953. | ||
27/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1955. Dep: 28/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21066 (Diagram 2) |
||
22/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1957. Dep: 29/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21061 (Diagram 2) |
||
23/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1962. Dep: 17/02/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21047 (Diagram 2) |
||
16/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
30/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63962 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
03/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |