|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1942 | 10/10/1942 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1943 | 27/02/1943 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/06/1944 | 15/07/1944 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/06/1947 | 03/08/1947 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/10/1949 | 09/11/1949 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 9364 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63965 |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1952 | 01/08/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 21055 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1954 | 05/11/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 21058 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/12/1956 | 26/01/1957 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 21035 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/08/1959 | 05/09/1959 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28963 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1961 | 14/10/1961 | 50 days | Light Repair |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/08/1959 | Doncaster Works (Stripping) | Paint shop- D223, D2066, D2265, D3060, 60075/511, 61825, 73010/165; Weigh-house- D224, D2065, 60006, 61211, 62054, 63934; New Erecting shop- D2067/8/9, E5010-4, D3070, D3137/49, D3230/2/3I; Crimpsall shops-No. 2 Bay- 12113, 13254, D3072, 61185, 61809/62/73/903/27, 63930/48, 68904/65; Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay- 60016/20/77/90/4/129/50/536; 61210, 62057 an 63957 on south side with Service loco 4; Stripping-60038/82, 61813/39, 63965, 70000, 73163/6. Awaiting cut up- 61661, 64181/258, 68973, 69515/7/45/8/76/84; Being cut up-60700, 61627, 64246, 69536/9. For condition reports- 61623, 68974, 69526/41/91. In yard D3229 an 11160. | SLS/195909 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/06/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3835 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1933 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
19/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/09/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942. | ||
06/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/02/1943. Dep: 27/02/1943. | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
03/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/06/1944. Dep: 15/07/1944. | ||
02/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3965 | ||
29/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1947. Dep: 03/08/1947. | ||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
09/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1949. Dep: 09/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9364 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63965 |
||
18/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
28/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
03/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
17/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
07/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1952. Dep: 01/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21055 (Diagram 2) |
||
06/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1954. Dep: 05/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21058 (Diagram 2) |
||
15/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1956. Dep: 26/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21035 (Diagram 2) |
||
06/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1959. Dep: 05/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28963 (Diagram 2) |
||
26/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1961. Dep: 14/10/1961. | ||
10/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63965 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
11/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |