|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1944 | 23/12/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1946 | 11/01/1947 | 61 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1947 | 30/05/1947 | 38 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1948 | 05/11/1948 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 9241 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63967 |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1948 | 20/12/1948 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/12/1949 | 29/12/1949 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1950 | 05/01/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 21012 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1953 | 18/09/1953 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21069 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1956 | 03/11/1956 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 21046 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1958 | 05/06/1958 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1961 | 03/07/1961 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 21008 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1962 | 09/11/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Stored) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
02/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Weigh House) | New Erecting Shop: D2394/5, E3064-9. Boiler Shop: E3070. Stripping Road: D2235, D3446, D3694, 60022, 60502/19, 61195, 61311. 61902/19, 64170, 70018/39. Scrap Yard: 61997 being cut up. Crimpsall: 61157, 61846. Outside Crimpsall: D3660, 61056/87, 76050. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D2402, D3449, D5571/2, D8211, 12124, 13253, 43154, 60009/30/62/73/7, 60142/55/6, 61074, 61167, 61378, 61893, 61906/43, 63928, 70009/23/7/35. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60029, 61231, 61850/65, 68591. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: D5534, 60099, 62059, 63967. Paint Shop: D2393, D6720, D9006, E3062/3, 13252, 60161, 61120. Outside Paint Shop: D351, D5347, D5804, D6719. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/08/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3837 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1935 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
25/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 23/12/1944. | ||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3967 | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
12/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1946. Dep: 11/01/1947. | ||
23/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/04/1947. Dep: 30/05/1947. | ||
28/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1948. Dep: 05/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9241 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63967 |
||
03/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/12/1948. Dep: 20/12/1948. | ||
16/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/12/1949. Dep: 29/12/1949. | ||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
11/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1950. Dep: 05/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21012 (Diagram 2) |
||
14/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1953. Dep: 18/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21069 (Diagram 2) |
||
30/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1956. Dep: 03/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21046 (Diagram 2) |
||
14/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/05/1958. Dep: 05/06/1958. | ||
23/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1961. Dep: 03/07/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21008 (Diagram 2) |
||
09/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 09/11/1962. Dep: 09/11/1962. | ||
26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63967 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
12/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |