|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1943 | 24/04/1943 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1945 | 14/04/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1946 | 18/01/1947 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1948 | 07/04/1948 | 31 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63971 |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1948 | 07/01/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 8463 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1951 | 17/05/1951 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 21023 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1953 | 29/05/1953 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 21008 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1954 | 29/04/1954 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1955 | 25/05/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 21011 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1957 | 07/12/1957 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 21066 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/07/1960 | 26/08/1960 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 21035 (Diagram 2) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/10/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3841 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1939 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
10/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/04/1943. Dep: 24/04/1943. | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
10/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 14/04/1945. | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3971 | ||
10/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1946. Dep: 18/01/1947. | ||
08/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1948. Dep: 07/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63971 |
||
05/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1948. Dep: 07/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8463 (Diagram 2) |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
18/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
07/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1951. Dep: 17/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21023 (Diagram 2) |
||
05/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1953. Dep: 29/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21008 (Diagram 2) |
||
05/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/04/1954. Dep: 29/04/1954. | ||
27/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1955. Dep: 25/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21011 (Diagram 2) |
||
10/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1957. Dep: 07/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21066 (Diagram 2) |
||
27/04/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
23/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1960. Dep: 26/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21035 (Diagram 2) |
||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63971 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |