|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1943 | 01/05/1943 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1944 | 27/05/1944 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/02/1945 | 17/03/1945 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1946 | 21/12/1946 | 49 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3972 |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1947 | 19/12/1947 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/12/1948 | 24/12/1948 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 9394 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63972 |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/04/1950 | 17/05/1950 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 9398 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/08/1952 | 23/09/1952 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 21058 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1954 | 21/10/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 21040 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1957 | 09/03/1957 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1960 | 06/12/1960 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 21044 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1962 | 05/04/1962 | 17 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/10/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3842 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1940 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
17/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/04/1943. Dep: 01/05/1943. | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
22/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/04/1944. Dep: 27/05/1944. | ||
17/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1945. Dep: 17/03/1945. | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
03/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3972 |
||
30/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/11/1947. Dep: 19/12/1947. | ||
14/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1948. Dep: 24/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9394 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63972 |
||
09/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1950. Dep: 17/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9398 (Diagram 2) |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
05/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
11/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
20/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1952. Dep: 23/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21058 (Diagram 2) |
||
20/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1954. Dep: 21/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21040 (Diagram 2) |
||
28/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1957. Dep: 09/03/1957. | ||
20/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1960. Dep: 06/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21044 (Diagram 2) |
||
20/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/03/1962. Dep: 05/04/1962. | ||
04/05/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63972 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |