|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1945 | 10/03/1945 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1946 | 17/08/1946 | 36 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3974 |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1946 | 28/12/1946 | 33 days | Heavy | Boiler number 9470 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1947 | 31/12/1947 | 25 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1948 | 23/07/1948 | 35 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63974 |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/05/1949 | 22/06/1949 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 9013 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/12/1951 | 24/01/1952 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 21004 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1954 | 12/05/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 21030 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/04/1956 | 08/05/1956 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 21027 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/06/1958 | 30/07/1958 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 21043 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1959 | 24/03/1959 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1960 | 18/10/1960 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1962 | 28/04/1962 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 21055 (Diagram 2) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/11/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3844 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1942 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945. | ||
13/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3974 |
||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
26/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 26/11/1946. Dep: 28/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9470 (Diagram 2) |
||
07/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/12/1947. Dep: 31/12/1947. | ||
19/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/06/1948. Dep: 23/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63974 |
||
25/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1949. Dep: 22/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9013 (Diagram 2) |
||
18/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
27/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
28/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1951. Dep: 24/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21004 (Diagram 2) |
||
10/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1954. Dep: 12/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21030 (Diagram 2) |
||
02/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1956. Dep: 08/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21027 (Diagram 2) |
||
20/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1958. Dep: 30/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21043 (Diagram 2) |
||
07/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/03/1959. Dep: 24/03/1959. | ||
03/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1960. Dep: 18/10/1960. | ||
05/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1962. Dep: 28/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21055 (Diagram 2) |
||
28/10/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63974 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
03/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |