|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1946 | 02/11/1946 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 9161 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3975 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/01/1949 | 11/02/1949 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 9319 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63975 |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/09/1951 | 10/10/1951 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 21036 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1953 | 23/04/1953 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/01/1954 | 06/02/1954 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 21039 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1955 | 07/06/1955 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1956 | 06/04/1956 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 21009 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1957 | 12/07/1957 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1958 | 27/09/1958 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 21020 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1959 | 23/01/1959 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/08/1959 | 05/09/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1962 | 12/07/1962 | 56 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. | SLS/194903 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster Works (Yard) | Erecting Shop-60162 (64B), 60003 (34A), 60035 (64B), 60017 (34A), 60145 (52A), 60103 (34A), 62030 (52C), 73000 (41B), 73155 (41C), 61122 (36A), 61971 (32A), 61889 (31B), 61820 (30F), 61890 (31B), 68987 (34B), 61162 (36A), 61846 (53A), 61409 (40B), 60001 (52A), 61158 (36A), 60526/502 (50A), 60039 (34A), 60152 (64B), 60026 (34A), 60520 (34F). Paint Shop-D3321 (52B), D3148 (51L), D5308 (34B), D6101/2 (34B), 60117 (56C), 61925 (36A), 60160 (64B), 62032 (31B). Yard-70030 (32A), 68914 (56B), 73016 (41C), 63940 (34F), D3079 (53A), 60508 (34E), 11182 (40A), 63975 (36A), 60063 (34F), 60095 (12C), 61816 (31B), 61406 (40B). Diesel Shop-E5001/2 motors in, D2050/1 motors in, 11106 (51C), 13147/51 (51L). Withdrawn-64216/7, 61606/48/22, 69493, 67397, 69544, 64201/74/6, 69551, 69593, 64205/49, 64183. | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/11/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3845 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1943 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
16/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. | ||
11/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
19/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9161 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3975 |
||
20/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
13/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1949. Dep: 11/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9319 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63975 |
||
12/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
18/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
18/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
07/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1951. Dep: 10/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21036 (Diagram 2) |
||
25/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/03/1953. Dep: 23/04/1953. | ||
12/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1954. Dep: 06/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21039 (Diagram 2) |
||
28/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/05/1955. Dep: 07/06/1955. | ||
05/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1956. Dep: 06/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21009 (Diagram 2) |
||
11/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/06/1957. Dep: 12/07/1957. | ||
16/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1958. Dep: 27/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21020 (Diagram 2) |
||
03/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/01/1959. Dep: 23/01/1959. | ||
27/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/08/1959. Dep: 05/09/1959. | ||
16/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
18/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1962. Dep: 12/07/1962. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 |
||
03/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63975 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |