|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1945 | 21/04/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1946 | 30/11/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 9160 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3979 |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/12/1947 | 23/01/1948 | 27 days | Heavy | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3979 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/12/1948 | 17/01/1949 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 9243 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63979 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/10/1951 | 12/11/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 21041 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/02/1954 | 10/03/1954 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 21001 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/07/1956 | 30/08/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21064 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1959 | 13/06/1959 | 30 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28111 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/12/1960 | 06/01/1961 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/09/1962 | 03/09/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/12/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3849 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1947 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
25/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
17/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945. | ||
09/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9160 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3979 |
||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
28/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/12/1947. Dep: 23/01/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3979 |
||
13/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1948. Dep: 17/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9243 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63979 |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
18/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
13/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1951. Dep: 12/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21041 (Diagram 2) |
||
17/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
11/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1954. Dep: 10/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21001 (Diagram 2) |
||
26/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1956. Dep: 30/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21064 (Diagram 2) |
||
15/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1959. Dep: 13/06/1959. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28111 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1960. Dep: 06/01/1961. | ||
03/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 03/09/1962. Dep: 03/09/1962. | ||
10/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63979 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
11/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |