|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1945 | 10/03/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1947 | 19/05/1947 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 9016 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1948 | 17/09/1948 | 39 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63984 |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1951 | 01/06/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 21026 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1951 | 24/08/1951 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/06/1954 | 23/07/1954 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 21046 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1956 | 31/10/1956 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 21036 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/06/1960 | 27/07/1960 | 48 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1962 | 03/03/1962 | 32 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Stored) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/12/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3854 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1952 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
29/03/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
27/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945. | ||
18/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3984 | ||
06/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1947. Dep: 19/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9016 (Diagram 2) |
||
10/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1948. Dep: 17/09/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63984 |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
07/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1951. Dep: 01/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21026 (Diagram 2) |
||
21/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/08/1951. Dep: 24/08/1951. | ||
17/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
30/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1954. Dep: 23/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21046 (Diagram 2) |
||
29/08/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
20/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1956. Dep: 31/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21036 (Diagram 2) |
||
10/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/06/1960. Dep: 27/07/1960. | ||
31/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1962. Dep: 03/03/1962. | ||
16/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
30/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
03/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63984 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |