|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1922 | 25/08/1922 | 158 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/07/1924 | 22/11/1924 | 120 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3473 |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1925 | 14/02/1925 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/04/1927 | 20/07/1927 | 111 days | General | Boiler number 7235 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/08/1929 | 25/10/1929 | 70 days | General | Gresham Feed Water Heater fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1932 | 30/04/1932 | 103 days | General | Gresham Feed Water Heater removed |
||
Gorton Works | 19/06/1934 | 25/08/1934 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 7714 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1936 | 09/05/1936 | 42 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1937 | 25/09/1937 | 47 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1938 | 03/08/1938 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 7707 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1940 | 14/08/1940 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 8460 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/09/1940 | 20/12/1940 | 103 days | Heavy | Air raid damage |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1943 | 03/03/1943 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/08/1944 | 23/09/1944 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1946 | 07/12/1946 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 8822 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3491 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1948 | 06/12/1948 | 48 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63491 |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1949 | 14/02/1949 | 35 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/11/1950 | 24/11/1950 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1919 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 473 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22100 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
21/03/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1922. Dep: 25/08/1922. | ||
26/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1924. Dep: 22/11/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3473 |
||
23/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/01/1925. Dep: 14/02/1925. | ||
01/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1927. Dep: 20/07/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7235 (Diagram 2) |
||
17/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1929. Dep: 25/10/1929. Work undertaken: Gresham Feed Water Heater fitted |
||
19/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1932. Dep: 30/04/1932. Work undertaken: Gresham Feed Water Heater removed |
||
19/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1934. Dep: 25/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7714 (Diagram 2) |
||
29/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936. | ||
10/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1937. Dep: 25/09/1937. | ||
03/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1938. Dep: 03/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7707 (Diagram 2) |
||
03/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1940. Dep: 14/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8460 (Diagram 2) |
||
09/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/09/1940. Dep: 20/12/1940. Work undertaken: Air raid damage |
||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
25/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1943. Dep: 03/03/1943. | ||
25/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1944. Dep: 23/09/1944. | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
28/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1946. Dep: 07/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8822 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3491 |
||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
20/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1948. Dep: 06/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63491 |
||
11/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/01/1949. Dep: 14/02/1949. | ||
24/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 24/11/1950. Dep: 24/11/1950. | ||
12/1950 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
18/12/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63491 from Doncaster (36A) |