Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 479 Today
» 642 Yesterday
» 4803 Week
» 11511 Month
» 164464 Year
» 1829840 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 331 m/e 10/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5331   15/06/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3504 on 31/01/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3585 on 24/02/1947
British Railways 63585   28/10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 10/1911
Withdrawal Thu 19/12/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Service Life 52 yrs, 2 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Round Oak Steel, Brierly Hill, 1/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1911
MEX   Mexborough on 30/03/1917
40E   Langwith Junction on 02/07/1950
40E   Colwick on 12/10/1958
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 30/12/1962
     Withdrawn on 19/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 12/01/1963
WDN   on 19/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1911 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1430)
01/11/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 279)
03/02/1922 Ross Pop
03/02/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1955)
07/03/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1706)
07/01/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1182)
25/04/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1164)
25/04/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
31/05/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1070)
07/11/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3290)
07/04/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3394)
17/11/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3287)
28/10/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22123)
18/10/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22298)
18/12/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22238)
21/09/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22187)
08/09/1960 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22896)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 20/09/1919 01/11/1919 43 days General Boiler number 279 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/01/1921 03/02/1922 378 days General Boiler number 1955 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1923 23/07/1923 67 days General    
Gorton Works 14/04/1925 15/06/1925 63 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5331
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1928 07/03/1928 56 days General Boiler number 1706 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1930 05/06/1930 62 days General    
Gorton Works 30/11/1932 07/01/1933 39 days General Boiler number 1182 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1936 25/04/1936 25 days General Boiler number 1164 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1939 31/05/1939 35 days General Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1942 07/11/1942 23 days General Boiler number 3290 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1945 07/04/1945 32 days General Boiler number 3394 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1947 17/11/1947 51 days General Boiler number 3287 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1950 28/10/1950 21 days General Boiler number 22123 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63585
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1950 05/11/1950 4 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 21/09/1952 18/10/1952 28 days General Boiler number 22298 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1952 28/10/1952 8 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 19/10/1954 18/12/1954 61 days General Boiler number 22238 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1957 21/09/1957 41 days General Boiler number 22187 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1957 26/09/1957 3 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 09/08/1960 08/09/1960 31 days General Boiler number 22896 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1911 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 331
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
30/03/1917 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
20/09/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1919. Dep: 01/11/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 279 (Diagram 15)
   
22/01/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1921. Dep: 03/02/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1955 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop
   
18/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1923. Dep: 23/07/1923.    
14/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1925. Dep: 15/06/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5331
   
12/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1928. Dep: 07/03/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1706 (Diagram 15)
   
05/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1930. Dep: 05/06/1930.    
30/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1932. Dep: 07/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1182 (Diagram 15)
   
01/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1936. Dep: 25/04/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1164 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
27/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1939. Dep: 31/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15)
   
16/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1942. Dep: 07/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3290 (Diagram 15)
   
07/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1945. Dep: 07/04/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3394 (Diagram 15)
   
31/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3504    
24/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3585    
28/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1947. Dep: 17/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3287 (Diagram 15)
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
08/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1950. Dep: 28/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22123 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63585
   
02/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/11/1950. Dep: 05/11/1950.    
21/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22298 (Diagram 15)
   
21/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1952. Dep: 28/10/1952.    
19/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1954. Dep: 18/12/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22238 (Diagram 15)
   
12/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1957. Dep: 21/09/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22187 (Diagram 15)
   
24/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/09/1957. Dep: 26/09/1957.    
12/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
09/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1960. Dep: 08/09/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22896 (Diagram 15)
   
30/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
19/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63585 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev