Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 975 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6586 Week
» 17632 Month
» 17632 Year
» 1683008 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 332 m/e 10/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5332 m/e 03/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3505 on 20/01/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3586 on 06/02/1947
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3586   29/02/1948
British Railways 63586 m/e 30/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 10/1911
Withdrawal Sun 03/10/1965 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping T W Ward (Killamarsh)
Service Life 54 yrs , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T.W. Ward, Killamarsh, 11/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1911
MEX Mexborough m/e 1923
DON Doncaster on 18/08/1946
40B Immingham on 25/06/1950
36B Mexborough on 09/12/1951
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 30/07/1961
36C Frodingham on 16/09/1962
   Withdrawn on 03/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   w/e 03/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1911 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1431)
02/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1464)
03/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1326)
12/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 549)
05/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1095)
05/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1284)
02/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3317)
02/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3260)
05/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3231)
14/01/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3466)
29/02/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 930)
18/11/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22130)
11/04/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22150)
09/03/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22234)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/1918   General  
Gorton Works 03/1925   General  
Gorton Works 12/1929   General  
Gorton Works 05/1932   General  
Gorton Works 05/1935   General  
Gorton Works 02/1938   General  
Gorton Works 02/1941   General  
Gorton Works 05/1943   General  
Gorton Works 05/01/1946 14/01/1946 10 days General
Boiler number 3466 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3505
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1948 29/02/1948 28 days General
Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3586
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1950 18/11/1950 27 days General
Boiler number 22130 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63586
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1950 07/12/1950 18 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 14/03/1953 11/04/1953 29 days General
Boiler number 22150 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1957 09/03/1957 33 days General
Boiler number 22234 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1961 11/11/1961 38 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 27/11/1961 01/12/1961 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 26/11/1962 11/01/1963 47 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering works during April included:- 2095, 2159, 2407, 2612, 2655, 2702, 2784, 2787, 2808, 2835, 2936, 2937, 2940, 2949, 2954, 2989, 3012, 3018, 3048, 3150, 3386, 3586, 3594, 4007, 4020, 4023, 4042, 4078, 4381, 4920, 4968, 4971, 5012, 5043, 5305, 5375, 5960, 5986, 6023, 6309, 6344, 6399, 6953, 6970, and L.M.S. 8465. Further 'Panniers' fitted with T.F. boilers are 3663, 8713, and 8794. Works' pilots during April included: 200, 207, 1542, 1795, 1796, 2723, 2773 and 3561. New engines reported are: 1029 PDN, 9404 PDN. SLS/194706
10/05/1947 Doncaster Works Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). SLS/194708
20/08/1947 Inverurie Works On 20/8 the following locos. were in the Works yard: 'D31' 2071, 'J36' (Number painted out but carrying plate 9653 - identified as 5229), old No. 'D41' 6879 (old No.), 'J36' 5251/72/87/91, 5302/32/36 (the latter marked 'scrap') 'G10' 7505, all complete; whilst those stripped were: 'D40' 2266/80, 'D31' (bearing plate 9765, old No.), 2067, 'J36' 5212/19. Locos. in the Works were 'D40' 2262/75, 'D41' 2234/42/44, 'J35' 4463/82/84, 'J36' 5257/69/84, 5325, while 'D41' 2256 and 'G5' 7287 were ex Works freshly painted. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1911 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 332
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
02/1918 Modification Diagram 15 number 1464 boiler fitted    
1923 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
03/1925 Modification Diagram 15 number 1326 boiler fitted    
03/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5332    
12/1929 Modification Diagram 15 number 549 boiler fitted    
05/1932 Modification Diagram 15 number 1095 boiler fitted    
05/1935 Modification Diagram 15 number 1284 boiler fitted    
02/1938 Modification Diagram 15 number 3317 boiler fitted    
02/1941 Modification Diagram 15 number 3260 boiler fitted    
05/1943 Modification Diagram 15 number 3231 boiler fitted    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
06/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3586    
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
09/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
30/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
16/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
03/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63586 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev