Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 25 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4497 Week
» 23398 Month
» 23398 Year
» 1688774 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 333 m/e 11/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5333   21/11/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3506 on 27/01/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3594 on 02/02/1947
British Railways 63594 w/e 09/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/111/1911
O1 (2-8-0)22/11/1947
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 11/1911
Withdrawal Tue 21/04/1964 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield)
Service Life 52 yrs, 5 mths , 21 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Smiths, Ecclesfield 5/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1911
MEX Mexborough on 24/07/1919
WFD Woodford Halse on 05/07/1929
DON Doncaster on 13/01/1946
FRO Frodingham on 18/01/1948
MEX Mexborough on 22/02/1948
ANN Annesley on 16/01/1949
38A Colwick on 03/11/1957
31B March on 24/02/1963
41H Staveley (G.C.) on 24/11/1963
   Withdrawn on 21/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 22/01/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 02/03/1963
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) on 25/11/1963
WDN   on 21/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1911 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1432)
06/04/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1507)
22/09/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1480)
21/11/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1071)
21/02/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1965)
06/08/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 945)
01/09/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1329)
24/10/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
24/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1008)
19/11/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3260)
11/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3427)
02/10/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3352)
16/03/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1271)
27/12/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28388)
04/12/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28901)
13/02/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28927)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 20/10/1917 06/04/1918 169 days General
Boiler number 1507 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/12/1920 05/02/1921 57 days General  
Gorton Works 07/07/1923 22/09/1923 78 days General
Boiler number 1480 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1925 21/11/1925 50 days General
Boiler number 1071 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5333
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1928 03/11/1928 36 days General  
Gorton Works 07/02/1931 21/02/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1932 06/08/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 945 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1934 01/09/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1329 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/10/1936 24/10/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1008 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1938 19/11/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3260 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/01/1941 11/01/1941 8 days General
Boiler number 3427 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1943 02/10/1943 11 days General
Boiler number 3352 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/04/1945 21/04/1945 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 02/03/1946 16/03/1946 15 days General
Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/08/1947 22/11/1947 92 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1949 09/04/1949 38 days Light Casual
Renumbered to BR 63594
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1950 06/05/1950 41 days General  
Gorton Works 11/06/1951 11/08/1951 62 days General  
Gorton Works 16/08/1951 21/08/1951 6 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 06/12/1952 27/12/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 28388 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1954 04/12/1954 36 days General
Boiler number 28901 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1955 19/03/1955 1 day Unclassified  
Gorton Works 08/12/1956 05/01/1957 29 days General  
Gorton Works 10/05/1958 14/06/1958 36 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 09/01/1960 13/02/1960 36 days General
Boiler number 28927 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1911 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 333
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
24/07/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
05/07/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
13/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
27/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3506    
02/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3594    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
22/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
16/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
03/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
21/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63594 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev