|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/11/1919 | 03/01/1920 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1498 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1922 | 01/04/1922 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1502 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/08/1924 | 20/12/1924 | 120 days | General | Boiler number 1436 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5334 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/09/1926 | 20/11/1926 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1928 | 29/09/1928 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1170 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1929 | 21/12/1929 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1932 | 16/01/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1040 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1934 | 21/07/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1196 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1936 | 29/08/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1938 | 29/10/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/02/1941 | 08/02/1941 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1943 | 30/10/1943 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/12/1946 | 25/01/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/08/1949 | 10/09/1949 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63598 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1952 | 26/04/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22263 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1952 | 02/01/1953 | 28 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 31/07/1954 | 04/09/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22270 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1956 | 11/08/1956 | 1 day | Unclassified | Tender only |
||
Gorton Works | 16/02/1957 | 16/03/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22255 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1960 | 14/05/1960 | 43 days | Light Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1911 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 334 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
15/01/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/11/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1919. Dep: 03/01/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1498 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/02/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1922. Dep: 01/04/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1502 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
23/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1924. Dep: 20/12/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1436 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5334 |
||
11/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1926. Dep: 20/11/1926. | ||
30/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1928. Dep: 29/09/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1170 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1929. Dep: 21/12/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1932. Dep: 16/01/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1040 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1934. Dep: 21/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1196 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/09/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
15/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1936. Dep: 29/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
15/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1938. Dep: 29/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1941. Dep: 08/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1943. Dep: 30/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3507 | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
21/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3598 | ||
27/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1949. Dep: 10/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63598 |
||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
05/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1952. Dep: 26/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22263 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/12/1952. Dep: 02/01/1953. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
31/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22270 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1956. Dep: 11/08/1956. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
16/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1957. Dep: 16/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22255 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 02/04/1960. Dep: 14/05/1960. | ||
03/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63598 from Gorton (9G) |