Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 541 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 541 Week
» 8153 Month
» 75015 Year
» 1740391 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 93 m/e 12/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5093   18/10/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3503   07/04/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3582 on 01/02/1947
British Railways 63582 w/e 08/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/112/1911
O4/7 (2-8-0)01/02/1941
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 12/1911
Withdrawal Fri 21/08/1959 off Gorton (9G)
Service Life 47 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1911
GOR   Gorton on 15/12/1921
MEX   Mexborough on 29/01/1924
CLK   Colwick on 19/09/1944
ANN   Annesley on 12/10/1947
CLK   Colwick on 22/01/1950
CLK   Colwick w/e 28/01/1950
39A   Gorton on 21/05/1950
     Withdrawn on 21/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 28/01/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 21/05/1950
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958
WDN   on 22/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1911 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1437)
01/11/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1431)
05/11/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1482)
03/09/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1449)
30/04/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1080)
17/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1876)
12/02/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3210)
01/02/1941 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3677)
16/10/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3663)
01/02/1947 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3683)
08/01/1949 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3665)
17/03/1951 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22315)
01/08/1953 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22872)
10/03/1956 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22303)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 27/09/1919 01/11/1919 36 days General Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1921 05/11/1921 43 days General Boiler number 1482 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/08/1924 18/10/1924 64 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5093
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1927 03/09/1927 99 days General Boiler number 1449 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1929 23/11/1929 36 days General    
Gorton Works 27/07/1935 08/1935   General    
Gorton Works 29/01/1938 12/02/1938 15 days General Chimney altered
Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1941 01/02/1941 15 days General Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3677 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 16/04/1942 30/04/1942 15 days General    
Gorton Works 02/10/1943 16/10/1943 15 days General Boiler number 3663 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1947 01/02/1947 22 days General Boiler number 3683 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to LNER (1947) number 3582
 
Gorton Works 18/12/1948 08/01/1949 22 days General Boiler number 3665 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63582
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1951 17/03/1951 22 days General Boiler number 22315 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 21/03/1951 22/03/1951 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 25/10/1952 08/11/1952 15 days Light Casual After collision
 
Gorton Works 27/06/1953 01/08/1953 36 days General Boiler number 22872 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 11/02/1956 10/03/1956 29 days General Boiler number 22303 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1956 04/08/1956 43 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 15/08/1959 15/08/1959 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1911 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 93
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
27/09/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1919. Dep: 01/11/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15)
   
24/09/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1921. Dep: 05/11/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1482 (Diagram 15)
   
15/12/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
29/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
16/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1924. Dep: 18/10/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5093
   
28/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1927. Dep: 03/09/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1449 (Diagram 15)
   
19/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1929. Dep: 23/11/1929.    
30/04/1932 Modification Diagram 15 number 1080 boiler fitted    
27/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1935. Dep: ?/08/1935.    
17/08/1935 Modification Diagram 15 number 1876 boiler fitted    
29/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1938. Dep: 12/02/1938.
Work undertaken:
Chimney altered
Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 15)
   
18/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1941. Dep: 01/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3677 (Diagram 15D)
   
16/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1942. Dep: 30/04/1942.    
02/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1943. Dep: 16/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3663 (Diagram 15D)
   
19/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
07/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3503    
11/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1947. Dep: 01/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3683 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to LNER (1947) number 3582
   
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
18/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1948. Dep: 08/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3665 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63582
   
22/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
28/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
24/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1951. Dep: 17/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22315 (Diagram 15D)
   
21/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/03/1951. Dep: 22/03/1951.    
25/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/10/1952. Dep: 08/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
27/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1953. Dep: 01/08/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22872 (Diagram 15D)
   
11/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1956. Dep: 10/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22303 (Diagram 15D)
   
23/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/06/1956. Dep: 04/08/1956.    
15/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 15/08/1959. Dep: 15/08/1959.    
21/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63582 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev