Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 15 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2180 Week
» 2180 Month
» 69042 Year
» 1734418 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 102 m/e 01/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5102   13/07/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3509   07/04/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3601 on 03/02/1947
British Railways 63601 w/e 03/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 01/1912
Withdrawal Sun 16/06/1963 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 51 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Ross pop safety valves fitted at shed 12/8/19
Listed for preservation 20/12/60. Stored 23/6/63 as part of NRM collection. Received at Doncaster 13/11/63 and moved to Stratford 15/11/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1912
GOR   Gorton on 29/09/1921
MEX   Mexborough on 30/01/1924
BRN   Barnsley on 08/12/1939
MEX   Mexborough on 13/12/1940
IMM   Immingham on 16/09/1945
MEX   Mexborough on 07/07/1946
DON   Doncaster on 29/12/1946
FRO   Frodingham on 18/01/1948
FRO   Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
40B   Immingham on 20/05/1951
40B   Immingham w/e 26/05/1951
39A   Gorton on 20/09/1953
36C   Frodingham on 18/07/1954
     Withdrawn on 16/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster on 29/12/1946
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 40B Immingham w/e 26/05/1951
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 14/08/1954
WDN   on 23/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1438)
03/06/1916 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1429)
16/07/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1501)
20/09/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1500)
12/11/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1951)
23/02/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 854)
02/09/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1203)
31/12/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1098)
25/02/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 547)
07/02/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3259)
17/05/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3293)
16/11/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1023)
03/09/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3261)
02/04/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22254)
10/07/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22214)
04/10/1960 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22877)

Preservation
Preservation Date 23/06/1963
Current Status Unserviceable
Link www.nrm.org.uk/
Status Date 20/03/2011


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 01/04/1916 03/06/1916 64 days General Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1919 16/07/1919 159 days General Boiler number 1501 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1921 20/09/1921 109 days General Boiler number 1500 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1923 12/11/1923 87 days General Boiler number 1951 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/05/1925 13/07/1925 53 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5102
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1927 23/02/1928 64 days General Boiler number 854 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/01/1930 20/03/1930 56 days General    
Gorton Works 05/08/1932 02/09/1932 29 days General Boiler number 1203 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/11/1935 31/12/1935 44 days General Knorr G Ring control
Boiler number 1098 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/01/1939 25/02/1939 56 days General Boiler number 547 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1941 07/02/1942 85 days General Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/04/1944 17/05/1944 19 days General Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/08/1945 24/08/1945 4 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 26/10/1946 16/11/1946 22 days General Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1949 03/09/1949 26 days General Boiler number 3261 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63601
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1952 02/04/1952 30 days General Boiler number 22254 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/06/1954 10/07/1954 38 days Heavy Casual Boiler number 22214 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/05/1955 25/06/1955 48 days Light Intermediate    
Gorton Works 11/12/1957 25/01/1958 46 days General    
Gorton Works 31/08/1960 04/10/1960 35 days General Boiler number 22877 (Diagram 15)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/05/1964 Doncaster Works (Side of Erecting Shop) Near Erecting Shop: E3101-4 bodies. Works Yard: D1562 damaged, 68925, DEP100, D5513, D5593, D5815, D5816, D6734, D6737, D6757, D8234. Inside Erecting Shop: 12103, D1695, D2212, D2216, D2572, D3631, D4061, D5052, D5526, D5575, D5582, D5601, D5688, D5693, D5814, D5820, D5831, D5838, D6720, D6744, D8211, D8239, D8400, D9015. Side of Stripping Shop: D3446. Side of Erecting Shop: 63601. Waiting Cutting Up: 90263. Stripping Shop: D1508, D3484, D5564, D5603, D9008. Outside Weigh Shop: D380 ex works, D2013 ex works, D1509, D4031, D5573, D5631. Inside Paint Shop: LNER 4771, E1217, D2563, D6898. Waiting Works: 61104, 63594, 63645, 63836, 90717. Ex Works: D5528. Stored: 61080, 90111, 90165, 90583, 92169, 92170, 92175. SLS/196406
07/06/1964 Doncaster Works (Back of Erecting Shop) Near Works: E3047, D5647, D6802, New Erecting Shop. E3101-6 Shells, D5052. Outside Paint Shop. D2212, complete with Cowcatchers and encased wheels, D5063, D5603, D6781, D6938 (Vulcan 3424/D882/1963). Outside Erecting Shop: D1512, D1525, D5637/9, D5801, D5824, D6702/97, D8232/6. Erecting Shop: D2216, D2228, D2562, D3251, D5511, D5529, D5552/69, D5593/9, D5821, D5845, D5850, D6715/24, D6815, D9012/8. Inside Paint Shop: D1508, D5550, D5564, D5635, D8400, 12103, LNER 4771, E1217, Stripping Shop Area: D4063, D5548, D5822, D7579. Back of Erecting Shop: D2563, 63601. Weigh Shop Area: D1503, D3446, D4031, D5508, D5679, D5846, D8048, D8068. SLS/196407
03/10/1964 Doncaster Works (Paint shop) Erecting shop: D1503/10/4/23/4/45/62/77, D1719/27, D3312, D5015/39, D5551/61/6, D5646/83/6, D6748, D8202/405, D9010, 15002; New Erecting Shop: E3101 Motors, E3102-10 Equip., E3111 Body; Outside Erecting shop: D1505/64/71/9, D1697, D1707, D3492, D5029/53, D5511/37/98, D5606/55/85, D5838/54, D6721/51, D6805/12, D8232, D9000/13. Paint shop: D2573, D2953, D5050, D5242, D5583, D6945, LNER 4771, E1217 with D6946 an 63601 outside; Weigh shop: D378, D1694, D2203, D3613, D5069, D5542; Stripping shop: D5518/31, D5643/62/91, D8225. At rear of stripping shop: D1500, D5512, D6750 an D9012. SLS/196411
24/10/1964 Stratford Works (Old Erecting shop) Old Erecting shop:, Locos. for preservation : LYR 1008, 30245/587/777/850/925, 33001, 49395, 71000, 63460, 63601 for preservation. (Note that GWR ones are still at Swindon.) SLS/196411

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 102
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
01/04/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1916. Dep: 03/06/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15)
   
08/02/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1919. Dep: 16/07/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1501 (Diagram 15)
   
04/06/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1921. Dep: 20/09/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1500 (Diagram 15)
   
29/09/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1923. Dep: 12/11/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1951 (Diagram 15)
   
30/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
22/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1925. Dep: 13/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5102
   
22/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1927. Dep: 23/02/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 854 (Diagram 15)
   
24/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1930. Dep: 20/03/1930.    
05/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1932. Dep: 02/09/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1203 (Diagram 15)
   
18/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1935. Dep: 31/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Knorr G Ring control
Boiler number 1098 (Diagram 15)
   
01/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 547 (Diagram 15)
   
08/12/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
13/12/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
15/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1941. Dep: 07/02/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15)
   
29/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1944. Dep: 17/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 15)
   
21/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/08/1945. Dep: 24/08/1945.    
16/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
07/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3509    
07/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
26/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 16/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15)
   
29/12/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
03/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3601    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
24/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
09/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1949. Dep: 03/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3261 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63601
   
20/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
26/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
04/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1952. Dep: 02/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22254 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
03/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 03/06/1954. Dep: 10/07/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22214 (Diagram 15)
   
18/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
09/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/05/1955. Dep: 25/06/1955.    
11/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1957. Dep: 25/01/1958.    
31/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1960. Dep: 04/10/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22877 (Diagram 15)
   
16/06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63601 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev