|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 01/04/1916 | 03/06/1916 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1919 | 16/07/1919 | 159 days | General | Boiler number 1501 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1921 | 20/09/1921 | 109 days | General | Boiler number 1500 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1923 | 12/11/1923 | 87 days | General | Boiler number 1951 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1925 | 13/07/1925 | 53 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5102 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1927 | 23/02/1928 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 854 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/01/1930 | 20/03/1930 | 56 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/08/1932 | 02/09/1932 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1203 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/11/1935 | 31/12/1935 | 44 days | General | Knorr G Ring control Boiler number 1098 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/01/1939 | 25/02/1939 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 547 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1941 | 07/02/1942 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1944 | 17/05/1944 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1945 | 24/08/1945 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1946 | 16/11/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1949 | 03/09/1949 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3261 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63601 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1952 | 02/04/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 22254 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/06/1954 | 10/07/1954 | 38 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22214 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1955 | 25/06/1955 | 48 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 11/12/1957 | 25/01/1958 | 46 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1960 | 04/10/1960 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 22877 (Diagram 15) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/05/1964 | Doncaster Works (Side of Erecting Shop) | Near Erecting Shop: E3101-4 bodies. Works Yard: D1562 damaged, 68925, DEP100, D5513, D5593, D5815, D5816, D6734, D6737, D6757, D8234. Inside Erecting Shop: 12103, D1695, D2212, D2216, D2572, D3631, D4061, D5052, D5526, D5575, D5582, D5601, D5688, D5693, D5814, D5820, D5831, D5838, D6720, D6744, D8211, D8239, D8400, D9015. Side of Stripping Shop: D3446. Side of Erecting Shop: 63601. Waiting Cutting Up: 90263. Stripping Shop: D1508, D3484, D5564, D5603, D9008. Outside Weigh Shop: D380 ex works, D2013 ex works, D1509, D4031, D5573, D5631. Inside Paint Shop: LNER 4771, E1217, D2563, D6898. Waiting Works: 61104, 63594, 63645, 63836, 90717. Ex Works: D5528. Stored: 61080, 90111, 90165, 90583, 92169, 92170, 92175. | SLS/196406 |
07/06/1964 | Doncaster Works (Back of Erecting Shop) | Near Works: E3047, D5647, D6802, New Erecting Shop. E3101-6 Shells, D5052. Outside Paint Shop. D2212, complete with Cowcatchers and encased wheels, D5063, D5603, D6781, D6938 (Vulcan 3424/D882/1963). Outside Erecting Shop: D1512, D1525, D5637/9, D5801, D5824, D6702/97, D8232/6. Erecting Shop: D2216, D2228, D2562, D3251, D5511, D5529, D5552/69, D5593/9, D5821, D5845, D5850, D6715/24, D6815, D9012/8. Inside Paint Shop: D1508, D5550, D5564, D5635, D8400, 12103, LNER 4771, E1217, Stripping Shop Area: D4063, D5548, D5822, D7579. Back of Erecting Shop: D2563, 63601. Weigh Shop Area: D1503, D3446, D4031, D5508, D5679, D5846, D8048, D8068. | SLS/196407 |
03/10/1964 | Doncaster Works (Paint shop) | Erecting shop: D1503/10/4/23/4/45/62/77, D1719/27, D3312, D5015/39, D5551/61/6, D5646/83/6, D6748, D8202/405, D9010, 15002; New Erecting Shop: E3101 Motors, E3102-10 Equip., E3111 Body; Outside Erecting shop: D1505/64/71/9, D1697, D1707, D3492, D5029/53, D5511/37/98, D5606/55/85, D5838/54, D6721/51, D6805/12, D8232, D9000/13. Paint shop: D2573, D2953, D5050, D5242, D5583, D6945, LNER 4771, E1217 with D6946 an 63601 outside; Weigh shop: D378, D1694, D2203, D3613, D5069, D5542; Stripping shop: D5518/31, D5643/62/91, D8225. At rear of stripping shop: D1500, D5512, D6750 an D9012. | SLS/196411 |
24/10/1964 | Stratford Works (Old Erecting shop) | Old Erecting shop:, Locos. for preservation : LYR 1008, 30245/587/777/850/925, 33001, 49395, 71000, 63460, 63601 for preservation. (Note that GWR ones are still at Swindon.) | SLS/196411 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 102 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
01/04/1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1916. Dep: 03/06/1916. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/02/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1919. Dep: 16/07/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1501 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/06/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1921. Dep: 20/09/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1500 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/09/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1923. Dep: 12/11/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1951 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
22/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1925. Dep: 13/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5102 |
||
22/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1927. Dep: 23/02/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 854 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1930. Dep: 20/03/1930. | ||
05/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1932. Dep: 02/09/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1203 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1935. Dep: 31/12/1935. Work undertaken: Knorr G Ring control Boiler number 1098 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 547 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
13/12/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
15/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1941. Dep: 07/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1944. Dep: 17/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/08/1945. Dep: 24/08/1945. | ||
16/09/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3509 | ||
07/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
26/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 16/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
03/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3601 | ||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
09/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1949. Dep: 03/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3261 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63601 |
||
20/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
04/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1952. Dep: 02/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22254 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
03/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 03/06/1954. Dep: 10/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22214 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
09/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/05/1955. Dep: 25/06/1955. | ||
11/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1957. Dep: 25/01/1958. | ||
31/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1960. Dep: 04/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22877 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63601 from Frodingham (36C) |