|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beyer Peacock Ltd. | 28/01/1920 | 03/12/1920 | 311 days | General | Boiler number 1097 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1922 | 19/02/1923 | 87 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1925 | 08/05/1925 | 87 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5133 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1928 | 08/02/1928 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 1033 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1930 | 18/08/1930 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/01/1933 | 25/02/1933 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 1093 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1935 | 20/12/1935 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 1457 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/01/1939 | 25/02/1939 | 49 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 03/05/1942 | 29/06/1942 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/08/1942 | 24/10/1942 | 63 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/06/1944 | 22/07/1944 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/04/1946 | 01/06/1946 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 3260 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3510 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/01/1948 | 08/02/1948 | 19 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3607 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1948 | 11/09/1948 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3422 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63607 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1949 | 25/06/1949 | 24 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1951 | 04/08/1951 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 22206 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1951 | 17/08/1951 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 07/11/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22154 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1956 | 02/06/1956 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 22109 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1958 | 09/08/1958 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 22113 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/12/1960 | 04/02/1961 | 43 days | Light Repair |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 133 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
19/01/1917 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
28/01/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Beyer Peacock Ltd. (General) - Arr: 28/01/1920. Dep: 03/12/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1097 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1922. Dep: 19/02/1923. | ||
11/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1925. Dep: 08/05/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5133 |
||
26/10/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
29/12/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
12/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1928. Dep: 08/02/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1033 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1930. Dep: 18/08/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1933. Dep: 25/02/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1093 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1935. Dep: 20/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1457 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
08/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939. | ||
03/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1942. Dep: 29/06/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1942. Dep: 24/10/1942. | ||
24/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1944. Dep: 22/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/09/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
07/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3260 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3510 |
||
07/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
09/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3607 | ||
21/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/01/1948. Dep: 08/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3607 |
||
04/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1948. Dep: 11/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3422 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63607 |
||
02/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1949. Dep: 25/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
26/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1951. Dep: 04/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22206 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/08/1951. Dep: 17/08/1951. | ||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
07/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22154 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
19/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1956. Dep: 02/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22109 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1958. Dep: 09/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22113 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
01/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
24/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/12/1960. Dep: 04/02/1961. | ||
23/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
30/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
05/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63607 from Colwick (40E) |