|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 17/04/1920 | 12/06/1920 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1856 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/06/1922 | 12/08/1922 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1924 | 07/02/1925 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1331 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5155 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/10/1927 | 03/12/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1929 | 14/12/1929 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1374 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1932 | 23/04/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 819 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1935 | 31/08/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1749 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/03/1938 | 16/04/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3325 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1941 | 05/07/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 945 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1944 | 04/03/1944 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1946 | 06/07/1946 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/11/1948 | 04/12/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3314 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63608 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/05/1951 | 16/06/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22192 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/05/1953 | 13/06/1953 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22146 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1955 | 09/07/1955 | 36 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1956 | 11/08/1956 | 43 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1958 | 12/07/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22219 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/05/1961 | 20/05/1961 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 155 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
17/04/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1920. Dep: 12/06/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1856 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/06/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1922. Dep: 12/08/1922. | ||
29/09/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
06/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1924. Dep: 07/02/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1331 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5155 |
||
22/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 03/12/1927. | ||
16/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1374 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1932. Dep: 23/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 819 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1935. Dep: 31/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1749 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1938. Dep: 16/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3325 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1941. Dep: 05/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 945 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1944. Dep: 04/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
20/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3511 | ||
03/02/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
22/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1946. Dep: 06/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3608 | ||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
13/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1948. Dep: 04/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3314 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63608 |
||
26/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1951. Dep: 16/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22192 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1953. Dep: 13/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22146 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/06/1955. Dep: 09/07/1955. | ||
30/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/06/1956. Dep: 11/08/1956. | ||
07/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1958. Dep: 12/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22219 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 20/05/1961. Dep: 20/05/1961. | ||
25/05/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63608 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |