Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 45 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 5602 Week
» 16747 Month
» 116532 Year
» 1781908 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 402 m/e 02/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5402   28/03/1925
War Dept. 769   26/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 02/1912
Withdrawal Sun 26/10/1941 off Mexborough (MEX)
Service Life 29 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 769 and sent to Middle East

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1912
MEX   Mexborough on 18/07/1919
DON   Doncaster on 21/07/1924
MEX   Mexborough on 23/08/1924
     Withdrawn on 26/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1440)
16/11/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1484)
28/07/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1949)
26/05/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1510)
15/10/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1854)
02/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1108)
22/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 924)
22/10/1938 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
11/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3255)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 01/06/1918 16/11/1918 169 days General Boiler number 1484 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/01/1921 26/02/1921 29 days General    
Gorton Works 28/04/1923 28/07/1923 92 days General Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/02/1925 28/03/1925 43 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5402
 
Gorton Works 21/04/1928 26/05/1928 36 days General Boiler number 1510 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1930 22/02/1930 36 days General    
Gorton Works 08/10/1932 15/10/1932 8 days General Boiler number 1854 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1935 02/11/1935 15 days General Boiler number 1108 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1938 22/10/1938 29 days General Boiler number 924 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1941 11/10/1941 18 days General Boiler number 3255 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 402
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
01/06/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1918. Dep: 16/11/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1484 (Diagram 15)
   
18/07/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
29/01/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1921. Dep: 26/02/1921.    
28/04/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1923. Dep: 28/07/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15)
   
21/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/08/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
14/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1925. Dep: 28/03/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5402
   
21/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1928. Dep: 26/05/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1510 (Diagram 15)
   
18/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1930. Dep: 22/02/1930.    
08/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1932. Dep: 15/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1854 (Diagram 15)
   
19/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1935. Dep: 02/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1108 (Diagram 15)
   
24/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1938. Dep: 22/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 924 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
24/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1941. Dep: 11/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3255 (Diagram 15)
   
26/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 769 from Mexborough (MEX)    
26/10/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 769    

prev prev