|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 14/10/1916 | 03/03/1917 | 141 days | General | Boiler number 1459 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1922 | 15/04/1922 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1460 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1924 | 08/11/1924 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5403 |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1926 | 02/04/1927 | 134 days | General | Boiler number 1238 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/07/1929 | 24/08/1929 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1878 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/11/1931 | 28/11/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1934 | 19/05/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1869 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1936 | 29/08/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/08/1938 | 01/10/1938 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1940 | 07/12/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1942 | 16/01/1943 | 18 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/07/1943 | 31/07/1943 | 6 days | Light Repair | Damaged by enemy action. Barrel plates & rivets damaged. |
||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1944 | 09/12/1944 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3407 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1947 | 07/06/1947 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/07/1949 | 06/08/1949 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63660 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1952 | 02/02/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22240 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/04/1954 | 05/05/1954 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 22209 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1956 | 15/12/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22259 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1959 | 05/09/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 403 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
14/10/1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1916. Dep: 03/03/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1459 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/04/1917 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
18/02/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1922. Dep: 15/04/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1460 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1924. Dep: 08/11/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5403 |
||
20/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1926. Dep: 02/04/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1238 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1929. Dep: 24/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1878 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1931. Dep: 28/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1934. Dep: 19/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1869 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1936. Dep: 29/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
27/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1938. Dep: 01/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Dep: 07/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1942. Dep: 16/01/1943. | ||
26/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/07/1943. Dep: 31/07/1943. Work undertaken: Damaged by enemy action. Barrel plates & rivets damaged. |
||
25/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3407 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
11/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
13/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3524 | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
06/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3660 | ||
10/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1947. Dep: 07/06/1947. | ||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
02/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1949. Dep: 06/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63660 |
||
12/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1952. Dep: 02/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22240 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1954. Dep: 05/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22209 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22259 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 05/09/1959. Dep: 05/09/1959. | ||
14/09/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63660 from Frodingham (36C) |