Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 22 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 863 Week
» 14799 Month
» 142242 Year
» 1807618 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 407 m/e 05/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5407   27/02/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3528   21/09/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3677 on 03/02/1947
British Railways 63677 w/e 22/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 05/1912
Withdrawal Fri 02/03/1962 off Doncaster (36A)
Service Life 49 yrs, 10 mths , 0 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1912
MEX   Mexborough on 30/09/1916
DON   Doncaster on 21/07/1924
CLK   Colwick on 27/10/1933
LNG   Langwith Junction on 20/02/1934
40D   Tuxford on 24/09/1950
37A   Ardsley on 27/09/1953
36B   Mexborough on 18/12/1955
36A   Doncaster on 22/03/1959
     Withdrawn on 02/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40D Tuxford w/e 24/09/1950
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 18/04/1959
WDN   on 02/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1447)
15/11/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1528)
17/12/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1536)
22/12/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1885)
07/07/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1344)
07/05/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1374)
05/10/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3209)
24/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1205)
13/07/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3404)
26/09/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 813)
21/10/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1235)
23/11/1946 Diagram 105 boiler fitted (number 8464)
22/01/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 863)
21/07/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22199)
05/12/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22187)
07/09/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22128)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 27/09/1919 15/11/1919 50 days General Boiler number 1528 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1921 17/12/1921 50 days General Boiler number 1536 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1923 22/12/1923 57 days General Boiler number 1885 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/12/1925 27/02/1926 85 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5407
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1928 07/07/1928 50 days General Boiler number 1344 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1930 05/07/1930 29 days General    
Gorton Works 30/04/1932 07/05/1932 8 days General Boiler number 1374 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1935 05/10/1935 15 days General Boiler number 3209 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1937 24/07/1937 22 days General Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1940 13/07/1940 8 days General Boiler number 3404 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1942 26/09/1942 13 days General Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1944 21/10/1944 8 days General Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1946 23/11/1946 22 days General Diagram 105 Boiler fitted
Boiler number 8464 (Diagram 105)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1948 22/01/1949 23 days General Reversion to Diagram 15 Boiler
Boiler number 863 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63677
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1951 21/07/1951 36 days General Boiler number 22199 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1953 05/12/1953 22 days General Boiler number 22187 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1957 07/09/1957 29 days General Boiler number 22128 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1962 17/02/1962 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 407
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
30/09/1916 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
27/09/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1919. Dep: 15/11/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1528 (Diagram 15)
   
29/10/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1921. Dep: 17/12/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1536 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1923. Dep: 22/12/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1885 (Diagram 15)
   
21/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
05/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1925. Dep: 27/02/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5407
   
19/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1928. Dep: 07/07/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1344 (Diagram 15)
   
07/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1930. Dep: 05/07/1930.    
30/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1932. Dep: 07/05/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1374 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
21/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1935. Dep: 05/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3209 (Diagram 15)
   
03/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1937. Dep: 24/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 15)
   
06/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3404 (Diagram 15)
   
14/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15)
   
14/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15)
   
21/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3528    
02/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Diagram 105 Boiler fitted
Boiler number 8464 (Diagram 105)
   
03/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3677    
31/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1948. Dep: 22/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Reversion to Diagram 15 Boiler
Boiler number 863 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63677
   
24/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
16/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1951. Dep: 21/07/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22199 (Diagram 15)
   
27/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
14/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1953. Dep: 05/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22187 (Diagram 15)
   
18/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
10/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1957. Dep: 07/09/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22128 (Diagram 15)
   
22/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
17/02/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 17/02/1962. Dep: 17/02/1962.    
02/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63677 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev