Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 48 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 5605 Week
» 16750 Month
» 116535 Year
» 1781911 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 408 m/e 05/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5408   15/07/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3529   01/09/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3678 on 26/02/1947
British Railways 63678 w/e 04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/105/1912
O1 (2-8-0)23/12/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 05/1912
Withdrawal Thu 18/07/1963 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Service Life 51 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 12/8/63

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1912
ANN   Annesley on 28/07/1921
GOR   Gorton on 07/01/1945
38B   Annesley on 26/11/1950
38B   Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
31B   March on 24/02/1957
41H   Staveley (G.C.) on 28/02/1960
     Withdrawn on 18/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 19/03/1960
WDN   on 18/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1448)
21/05/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1881)
15/07/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 111)
11/12/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 932)
20/08/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 512)
22/08/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1329)
04/08/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 588)
24/06/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 943)
24/06/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
18/06/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3334)
08/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3399)
21/11/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3213)
23/12/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5018)
28/12/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5022)
14/05/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5006)
29/12/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28367)
13/03/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28343)
21/04/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28893)
01/03/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28839)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 1921 21/05/1921   General Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/11/1923 05/01/1924 64 days General    
Gorton Works 16/04/1926 15/07/1926 91 days General Boiler number 111 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5408
 
Gorton Works 16/08/1928 11/12/1928 118 days General Boiler number 932 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/05/1929 20/08/1929 88 days General Boiler number 512 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1931 22/08/1931 27 days General Boiler number 1329 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/07/1934 04/08/1934 35 days General Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1936 24/06/1936 25 days General Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1938 18/06/1938 30 days General Boiler number 3334 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1940 08/06/1940 24 days General Boiler number 3399 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1942 21/11/1942 11 days General Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/08/1944 23/12/1944 145 days General Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5018 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1946 28/12/1946 22 days General Boiler number 5022 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 01/09/1948 04/09/1948 4 days Light Casual Renumbered to BR 63678
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1949 14/05/1949 50 days General Boiler number 5006 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1950 22/04/1950 1 day Light Casual    
Gorton Works 22/11/1951 29/12/1951 38 days General Boiler number 28367 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 14/02/1954 13/03/1954 28 days General Boiler number 28343 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1954 26/03/1954 11 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 02/10/1955 24/11/1955 54 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 15/03/1956 21/04/1956 38 days General Boiler number 28893 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 27/01/1958 01/03/1958 34 days General Boiler number 28839 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1960 13/08/1960 45 days Heavy Intermediate    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/08/1963 Doncaster Works (Yard) New Erecting Shop: E3085/6/95, D1507/13/4. Crimpsall Diesel Bay: 12111, D2570, D3160, D3620/2/36/9/49/81/93, D5037/45, D5502, D5649/67/73/82, D5852, D6713/4, D6801, D8229, D9015/7/20. Crimpsall Steam Bay: 60009/65/94, 62011/22, 90015/313/471 and Dept. 11 (68914). Yard: 12135, D2407, D3159, D3495, D3632, D5500/12/48/52/8/72/96, D5610/47/83, D6721, 60008/14/22/32/46/97, 60830, 63678, 63704/18, 68925, 69523, 90269/502. Paint Shop: 60800. Outside Weigh House: D5068, D5659, D6864, 90449. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 408
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: 21/05/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15)
   
28/07/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
03/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1923. Dep: 05/01/1924.    
16/04/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1926. Dep: 15/07/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 111 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5408
   
16/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1928. Dep: 11/12/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 932 (Diagram 15)
   
25/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1929. Dep: 20/08/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 512 (Diagram 15)
   
27/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1931. Dep: 22/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1329 (Diagram 15)
   
01/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1934. Dep: 04/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15)
   
31/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1936. Dep: 24/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
20/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3334 (Diagram 15)
   
16/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3399 (Diagram 15)
   
11/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1942. Dep: 21/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15)
   
01/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1944. Dep: 23/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5018 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3529    
07/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1946. Dep: 28/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5022 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3678    
01/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/09/1948. Dep: 04/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63678
   
26/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1949. Dep: 14/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5006 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/04/1950. Dep: 22/04/1950.    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
22/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1951. Dep: 29/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28367 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1954. Dep: 13/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28343 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/03/1954. Dep: 26/03/1954.    
02/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/10/1955. Dep: 24/11/1955.    
15/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1956. Dep: 21/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28893 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
27/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1958. Dep: 01/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28839 (Diagram 100A)
   
28/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
30/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/06/1960. Dep: 13/08/1960.    
18/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63678 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev