Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 48 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5579 Week
» 7317 Month
» 134760 Year
» 1800136 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 351 m/e 08/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5351   01/05/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3517   21/04/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3635 on 12/03/1947
British Railways 63635 w/e 26/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 404
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal Wed 09/05/1962 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Service Life 49 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1912
ANN   Annesley on 18/03/1915
CLK   Colwick on 29/06/1947
ANN   Annesley on 12/10/1947
39A   Gorton on 26/11/1950
39A   Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
39B   Sheffield Darnall on 13/06/1954
40D   Tuxford on 09/01/1955
41J   Langwith Junction on 01/02/1959
     Withdrawn on 09/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 29/06/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 12/10/1947
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   on 09/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1524)
23/04/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1878)
23/04/1921 Ross Pop
18/05/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1855)
03/10/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1145)
23/12/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1114)
21/03/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 825)
12/03/1938 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
12/03/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1006)
20/04/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3393)
10/12/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1010)
27/10/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3344)
23/08/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3327)
26/03/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3347)
28/04/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22180)
27/06/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22152)
29/03/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22887)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 19/03/1921 23/04/1921 36 days General Boiler number 1878 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1923 22/09/1923 57 days General    
Gorton Works 06/03/1926 01/05/1926 57 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5351
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1929 18/05/1929 106 days General Boiler number 1855 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/09/1931 03/10/1931 15 days General Boiler number 1145 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1933 23/12/1933 15 days General Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/03/1936 21/03/1936 8 days General Boiler number 825 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1938 12/03/1938 22 days General Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1940 20/04/1940 8 days General Boiler number 3393 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 02/11/1942 10/12/1942 39 days General Boiler number 1010 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/09/1943 11/09/1943 11 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 08/07/1944 22/07/1944 15 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 06/10/1945 27/10/1945 22 days General Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/08/1947 23/08/1947 22 days General Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/02/1949 26/03/1949 29 days General Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63635
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1951 28/04/1951 15 days General Boiler number 22180 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1953 27/06/1953 15 days General Boiler number 22152 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1955 07/01/1956 43 days General    
Gorton Works 22/02/1958 29/03/1958 36 days Heavy Casual Boiler number 22887 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1959 14/02/1959 29 days Heavy Intermediate Water Treatment fitted
 
Gorton Works 28/04/1962 28/04/1962 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 351
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
18/03/1915 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
19/03/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1921. Dep: 23/04/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1878 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop
   
28/07/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1923. Dep: 22/09/1923.    
06/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1926. Dep: 01/05/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5351
   
02/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1929. Dep: 18/05/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1855 (Diagram 15)
   
19/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1931. Dep: 03/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1145 (Diagram 15)
   
09/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1933. Dep: 23/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 15)
   
14/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1936. Dep: 21/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 825 (Diagram 15)
   
19/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1938. Dep: 12/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
13/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1940. Dep: 20/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3393 (Diagram 15)
   
02/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1942. Dep: 10/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1010 (Diagram 15)
   
01/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/09/1943. Dep: 11/09/1943.    
08/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/07/1944. Dep: 22/07/1944.    
06/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1945. Dep: 27/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15)
   
21/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3517    
12/03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3635    
29/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
02/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1947. Dep: 23/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15)
   
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
26/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1949. Dep: 26/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63635
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
14/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1951. Dep: 28/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22180 (Diagram 15)
   
13/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1953. Dep: 27/06/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22152 (Diagram 15)
   
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
09/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
26/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1955. Dep: 07/01/1956.    
22/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/02/1958. Dep: 29/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22887 (Diagram 15)
   
17/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/01/1959. Dep: 14/02/1959.
Work undertaken:
Water Treatment fitted
   
01/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
28/04/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 28/04/1962. Dep: 28/04/1962.    
09/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63635 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev