|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/12/1916 | 02/07/1917 | 213 days | General | Fitted with Pulveriser Boiler number 1171 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1920 | 14/02/1920 | 36 days | Light Repair | Altered back to coal burning |
||
Gorton Works | 24/12/1921 | 28/01/1922 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1524 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1924 | 05/07/1924 | 50 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5353 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/10/1926 | 18/12/1926 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1860 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/02/1929 | 11/05/1929 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1931 | 01/08/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1416 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/11/1933 | 02/12/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1936 | 01/02/1936 | 22 days | General | Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/08/1938 | 27/08/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3342 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1941 | 25/01/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3366 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1943 | 30/10/1943 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3689 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1945 | 06/10/1945 | 8 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/05/1947 | 21/06/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3657 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1949 | 29/10/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22321 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63643 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1951 | 23/06/1951 | 15 days | Light Casual | Tender repair only |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1952 | 24/05/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22333 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1953 | 16/05/1953 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 31/07/1954 | 28/08/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22327 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1956 | 17/03/1956 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22309 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1957 | 28/05/1957 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 22312 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1958 | 15/03/1958 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1959 | 03/06/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1960 | 26/11/1960 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/12/1960 | Gorton Works (Works Sidings) | Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 353 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
02/12/1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1916. Dep: 02/07/1917. Work undertaken: Fitted with Pulveriser Boiler number 1171 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/01/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/01/1920. Dep: 14/02/1920. Work undertaken: Altered back to coal burning |
||
24/12/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1921. Dep: 28/01/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1524 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/03/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
06/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
17/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1924. Dep: 05/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5353 |
||
09/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1926. Dep: 18/12/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1860 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/12/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
16/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1929. Dep: 11/05/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1931. Dep: 01/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1416 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1933. Dep: 02/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/12/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
11/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1936. Dep: 01/02/1936. Work undertaken: Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
13/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1938. Dep: 27/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3342 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1941. Dep: 25/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3366 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1943. Dep: 30/10/1943. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3689 (Diagram 15D) |
||
29/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945. | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
16/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3519 | ||
23/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3643 | ||
24/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3657 (Diagram 15D) |
||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
08/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1949. Dep: 29/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22321 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63643 |
||
10/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
09/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/06/1951. Dep: 23/06/1951. Work undertaken: Tender repair only |
||
03/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1952. Dep: 24/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22333 (Diagram 15D) |
||
05/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1953. Dep: 16/05/1953. | ||
31/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1954. Dep: 28/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22327 (Diagram 15D) |
||
09/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
25/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/02/1956. Dep: 17/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22309 (Diagram 15D) |
||
04/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1957. Dep: 28/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22312 (Diagram 15D) |
||
08/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/03/1958. Dep: 15/03/1958. | ||
01/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
25/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1959. Dep: 03/06/1959. Work undertaken: Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
16/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
26/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 26/11/1960. Dep: 26/11/1960. | ||
30/11/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63643 from Immingham (40B) |