|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beyer Peacock Ltd. | 19/07/1920 | 22/04/1921 | 278 days | General | Boiler number 1450 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1923 | 31/03/1923 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1923 | 05/05/1923 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1925 | 22/08/1925 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6185 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1928 | 12/05/1928 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 866 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1930 | 19/04/1930 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1932 | 03/12/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1676 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1935 | 21/09/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1007 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/08/1938 | 24/09/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3348 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1941 | 13/09/1941 | 6 days | General | Boiler number 3289 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1185 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4893 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
13/08/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
19/07/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Beyer Peacock Ltd. (General) - Arr: 19/07/1920. Dep: 22/04/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1450 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1923. Dep: 31/03/1923. | ||
05/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/05/1923. Dep: 05/05/1923. | ||
06/06/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ) | ||
02/11/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
13/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1925. Dep: 22/08/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6185 |
||
14/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1928. Dep: 12/05/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 866 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1930. Dep: 19/04/1930. | ||
26/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1932. Dep: 03/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1676 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1935. Dep: 21/09/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1007 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1938. Dep: 24/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3348 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3289 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 730 from Mexborough (MEX) | ||
14/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 730 |