Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 79 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 79 Week
» 11224 Month
» 111009 Year
» 1776385 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1187 m/e 07/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6187   21/06/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3534   01/09/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3684 on 02/02/1947
British Railways 63684 w/e 18/03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4895
To Service During 07/1912
Withdrawal Thu 12/12/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Service Life 51 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Round Oak Steel, Brierley Hill, 1/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1912
MEX   Mexborough on 15/08/1912
DON   Doncaster on 20/10/1947
FRO   Frodingham on 18/01/1948
FRO   Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
38A   Colwick on 18/03/1951
38A   Colwick m/e 31/03/1951
36B   Mexborough on 29/01/1956
41A   Sheffield Darnall on 09/12/1962
41F   Mexborough on 20/01/1963
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 22/09/1963
     Withdrawn on 12/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 38A Colwick m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 3w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 6w/e 05/10/1963
WDN   on 12/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1453)
15/05/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1853)
22/06/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 807)
27/11/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1219)
01/12/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1339)
21/05/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3290)
17/10/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3381)
03/03/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3332)
20/08/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3407)
18/03/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3336)
09/08/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22282)
17/09/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22254)
28/12/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22298)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 28/02/1920 15/05/1920 78 days General Boiler number 1853 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1922 02/09/1922 57 days General    
Gorton Works 19/04/1924 21/06/1924 64 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6187
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1927 22/06/1927 65 days General Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1929 17/05/1929 35 days General    
Gorton Works 17/10/1931 27/11/1931 42 days General Boiler number 1219 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1934 01/12/1934 33 days General Boiler number 1339 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1937 21/05/1937 50 days General Boiler number 3290 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1939 02/12/1939 19 days General    
Gorton Works 25/09/1942 17/10/1942 23 days General Boiler number 3381 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1945 03/03/1945 54 days General Boiler number 3332 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1947 20/08/1947 53 days General Boiler number 3407 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1950 18/03/1950 26 days General Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63684
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1952 09/08/1952 51 days General Boiler number 22282 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/07/1954 17/09/1954 54 days General Boiler number 22254 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1957 28/12/1957 64 days General Boiler number 22298 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1960 23/03/1960 48 days Light Casual    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1187
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4895
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
15/08/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
28/02/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1920. Dep: 15/05/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1853 (Diagram 15)
   
08/07/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1922. Dep: 02/09/1922.    
19/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1924. Dep: 21/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6187
   
19/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1927. Dep: 22/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15)
   
13/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1929. Dep: 17/05/1929.    
17/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1931. Dep: 27/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1219 (Diagram 15)
   
30/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1934. Dep: 01/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1339 (Diagram 15)
   
02/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1937. Dep: 21/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3290 (Diagram 15)
   
14/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1939. Dep: 02/12/1939.    
25/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3381 (Diagram 15)
   
09/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3332 (Diagram 15)
   
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3534    
02/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3684    
29/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1947. Dep: 20/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3407 (Diagram 15)
   
20/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
24/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
21/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1950. Dep: 18/03/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63684
   
18/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
20/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1952. Dep: 09/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22282 (Diagram 15)
   
26/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1954. Dep: 17/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22254 (Diagram 15)
   
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
26/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1957. Dep: 28/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22298 (Diagram 15)
   
05/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/02/1960. Dep: 23/03/1960.    
09/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
20/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
22/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
12/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63684 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev