Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 53 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5584 Week
» 7322 Month
» 134765 Year
» 1800141 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1190 m/e 07/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6190   20/12/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3537   14/06/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3693 on 01/02/1947
British Railways 63693 w/e 10/02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4898
To Service During 07/1912
Withdrawal Mon 19/11/1962 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 50 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Round Oak Steel, Brierley Hill, 2/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1912
MEX   Mexborough on 20/08/1912
FRO   Frodingham on 16/09/1945
DON   Doncaster on 07/04/1946
40B   Immingham on 25/06/1950
36B   Mexborough on 09/12/1951
36B   Mexborough 4w/e 29/12/1951
36A   Doncaster on 22/03/1959
36C   Frodingham on 16/09/1962
     Withdrawn on 19/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   on 25/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1456)
02/02/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1466)
04/03/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1144)
03/11/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1952)
17/09/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 813)
09/09/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1224)
28/04/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 818)
28/04/1934 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
16/01/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1224)
23/03/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3390)
10/10/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 805)
19/08/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3264)
10/05/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3371)
10/02/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22162)
12/12/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22224)
19/10/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22880)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 18/08/1917 02/02/1918 169 days General Boiler number 1466 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1922 04/03/1922 36 days General Boiler number 1144 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1923 03/11/1923 92 days General Boiler number 1952 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/11/1924 20/12/1924 43 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6190
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1927 17/09/1927 85 days General Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1929 08/06/1929 36 days General    
Gorton Works 29/08/1931 09/09/1931 12 days General Boiler number 1224 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1934 28/04/1934 15 days General Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1936 16/01/1937 17 days General Boiler number 1224 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1940 23/03/1940 22 days General Boiler number 3390 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1942 10/10/1942 18 days General Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1944 19/08/1944 15 days General Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1947 10/05/1947 29 days General Boiler number 3371 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/01/1951 10/02/1951 15 days General Boiler number 22162 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63693
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1951 17/11/1951 8 days Light Casual After collision
 
Gorton Works 21/11/1953 12/12/1953 22 days General Boiler number 22224 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1957 19/10/1957 29 days General Boiler number 22880 (Diagram 15)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General FURTHER RENUMBERING OF ENGINES. This Company recently purchased some of the W.D. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 engines, which are taking the numbers 3000-3199. This necessitates the renumbering of the 'O4' Class engines numbered between 3500 and 3569, and the 'O6' class engines Nos. 3100-3167. The latter will become 3500-3567, whilst the 'O4' class engines will fill some of the blanks in series 3572-3809, thus enabling all three classes to take consecutive numbers. The 'Austerity' engines are now Class 'O7', but it is not certain that all those at present on the L.N.E.R. system have been taken over as the total exceeds 200. Should others be acquired it would presumably be necessary to renumber the 'Q4' class at present in series 3200-3243; this would allow for a further 50 of the 'O7' to follow after 3199. The first of the 'O4' to get its latest number was 3537 (originally 6189, G.C. 1189), which became 3693 on 1/2/47. Nos. 3112, 3144 and 3159 had their numbers increased by 400 on 2/2/47, the first of the 'O6' to be altered; whilst the first of the 'O7' to receive L.N.E.R. Nos. were 77318/36, which became 3007/9 on 1/2/47. The 'O7' are not being renumbered in order of works numbers, as the 'O4' originally were, but the engines by the N.B. Loco. Co. are allotted Nos. 3000-3100 and those built by the Vulcan Foundry are Nos. 3101-3199; the Vulcans are apparently in order of W.D. running numbers finishing with 3199 ex 79308. SLS/194704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1190
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4898
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
20/08/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
18/08/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1917. Dep: 02/02/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1466 (Diagram 15)
   
28/01/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1922. Dep: 04/03/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1144 (Diagram 15)
   
04/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1923. Dep: 03/11/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1952 (Diagram 15)
   
08/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1924. Dep: 20/12/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6190
   
25/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1927. Dep: 17/09/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15)
   
04/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1929. Dep: 08/06/1929.    
29/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1931. Dep: 09/09/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1224 (Diagram 15)
   
14/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1934. Dep: 28/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
31/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1936. Dep: 16/01/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1224 (Diagram 15)
   
02/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1940. Dep: 23/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3390 (Diagram 15)
   
23/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15)
   
05/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1944. Dep: 19/08/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15)
   
16/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
14/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3537    
01/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3693    
12/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1947. Dep: 10/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3371 (Diagram 15)
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
27/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1951. Dep: 10/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22162 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63693
   
10/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/11/1951. Dep: 17/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
09/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
21/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1953. Dep: 12/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22224 (Diagram 15)
   
21/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1957. Dep: 19/10/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22880 (Diagram 15)
   
22/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
16/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
19/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63693 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev