|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 13/05/1922 | 22/07/1922 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1511 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1924 | 08/11/1924 | 134 days | General | Boiler number 1863 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6191 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/06/1927 | 30/07/1927 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1929 | 07/12/1929 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1483 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/06/1932 | 18/06/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1404 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/02/1935 | 16/02/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1956 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1937 | 12/06/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3292 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/11/1939 | 18/11/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/06/1942 | 04/07/1942 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1943 | 03/07/1943 | 26 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/09/1944 | 30/09/1944 | 19 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/02/1946 | 09/03/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3330 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/03/1948 | 17/04/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3324 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63698 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1951 | 27/01/1951 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22155 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1953 | 26/12/1953 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22162 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1957 | 23/11/1957 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22197 (Diagram 15) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/03/1963 | Doncaster Works (Waiting Works) | Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. | SLS/196304 |
11/05/1963 | Worcester Works (Waiting Works) | 4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1191 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4899 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
24/08/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
13/05/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1922. Dep: 22/07/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1511 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1924. Dep: 08/11/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1863 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6191 |
||
11/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1927. Dep: 30/07/1927. | ||
16/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1929. Dep: 07/12/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1483 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1932. Dep: 18/06/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1404 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
19/08/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
09/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1935. Dep: 16/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1956 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1937. Dep: 12/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3292 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1939. Dep: 18/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1942. Dep: 04/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1943. Dep: 03/07/1943. | ||
12/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944. | ||
16/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1946. Dep: 09/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3330 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
22/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3538 | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
27/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3698 | ||
20/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1948. Dep: 17/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3324 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63698 |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
13/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1951. Dep: 27/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22155 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
12/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1953. Dep: 26/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22162 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1957. Dep: 23/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22197 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/04/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
09/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63698 from Doncaster (36A) |