Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 79 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 79 Week
» 11224 Month
» 111009 Year
» 1776385 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1191 m/e 08/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6191   08/11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3538   22/09/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3698 on 27/02/1947
British Railways 63698 w/e 17/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4899
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal Sun 09/12/1962 off Doncaster (36A)
Service Life 50 yrs, 4 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 17/7/63

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1912
MEX   Mexborough on 24/08/1912
LIN   Lincoln on 29/06/1932
FRO   Frodingham on 19/08/1933
LNG   Langwith Junction on 07/04/1946
DON   Doncaster on 27/10/1946
40B   Immingham on 25/06/1950
40B   Immingham m/e 30/06/1950
36B   Mexborough on 09/12/1951
36B   Mexborough 4w/e 29/12/1951
36A   Doncaster on 05/04/1959
     Withdrawn on 09/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 40B Immingham m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 18/04/1959
WDN   on 09/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1457)
22/07/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1511)
08/11/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1863)
07/12/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1483)
18/06/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1404)
16/02/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1956)
12/06/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3292)
18/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1181)
04/07/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3203)
09/03/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3330)
17/04/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3324)
27/01/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22155)
26/12/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22162)
23/11/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22197)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 13/05/1922 22/07/1922 71 days General Boiler number 1511 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1924 08/11/1924 134 days General Boiler number 1863 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6191
 
Gorton Works 11/06/1927 30/07/1927 50 days General    
Gorton Works 16/11/1929 07/12/1929 22 days General Boiler number 1483 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/06/1932 18/06/1932 8 days General Boiler number 1404 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/02/1935 16/02/1935 8 days General Boiler number 1956 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/05/1937 12/06/1937 22 days General Boiler number 3292 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1939 18/11/1939 15 days General Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1942 04/07/1942 15 days General Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1943 03/07/1943 26 days General    
Gorton Works 12/09/1944 30/09/1944 19 days General    
Gorton Works 16/02/1946 09/03/1946 22 days General Boiler number 3330 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1948 17/04/1948 29 days General Boiler number 3324 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63698
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1951 27/01/1951 15 days General Boiler number 22155 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1953 26/12/1953 15 days General Boiler number 22162 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1957 23/11/1957 22 days General Boiler number 22197 (Diagram 15)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/03/1963 Doncaster Works (Waiting Works) Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. SLS/196304
11/05/1963 Worcester Works (Waiting Works) 4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1191
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4899
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
24/08/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
13/05/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1922. Dep: 22/07/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1511 (Diagram 15)
   
28/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1924. Dep: 08/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1863 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6191
   
11/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1927. Dep: 30/07/1927.    
16/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1929. Dep: 07/12/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1483 (Diagram 15)
   
11/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1932. Dep: 18/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1404 (Diagram 15)
   
29/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
19/08/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
09/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1935. Dep: 16/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1956 (Diagram 15)
   
22/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1937. Dep: 12/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3292 (Diagram 15)
   
04/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1939. Dep: 18/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15)
   
20/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1942. Dep: 04/07/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 15)
   
08/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1943. Dep: 03/07/1943.    
12/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944.    
16/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1946. Dep: 09/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3330 (Diagram 15)
   
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
22/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3538    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
27/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3698    
20/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1948. Dep: 17/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3324 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63698
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
30/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
13/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1951. Dep: 27/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22155 (Diagram 15)
   
09/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
12/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1953. Dep: 26/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22162 (Diagram 15)
   
02/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1957. Dep: 23/11/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22197 (Diagram 15)
   
05/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
09/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63698 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev