Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 4 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4476 Week
» 23377 Month
» 23377 Year
» 1688753 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1194 m/e 09/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6194   31/12/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3541   22/09/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3710 on 02/02/1947
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3710   17/01/1948
British Railways 63710 w/e 28/10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4902
To Service During 09/1912
Withdrawal Mon 13/07/1959 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 46 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 8/59

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1912
MEX Mexborough on 18/09/1912
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 27/04/1947
   Withdrawn on 13/07/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall on 27/04/1947
WDN   on 13/07/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1460)
07/07/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1687)
08/11/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1514)
07/01/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 279)
07/01/1922 Ross Pop
31/12/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1168)
30/03/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1960)
10/10/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 929)
02/06/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1177)
30/01/1937 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
30/01/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1882)
09/03/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1852)
10/04/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 863)
20/10/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3398)
17/01/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3308)
02/09/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3333)
21/03/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22142)
10/12/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22135)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 10/03/1917 07/07/1917 120 days General
Boiler number 1687 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/08/1919 08/11/1919 78 days General
Boiler number 1514 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1921 07/01/1922 64 days General
Boiler number 279 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1923 15/12/1923 64 days General  
Gorton Works 09/10/1926 31/12/1926 84 days General
Boiler number 1168 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6194
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1928 30/03/1929 99 days General
Boiler number 1960 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/09/1931 10/10/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 929 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1934 02/06/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1177 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1937 30/01/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1940 09/03/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 1852 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1943 10/04/1943 11 days General
Boiler number 863 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1945 20/10/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 3398 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1947 17/01/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 3308 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3710
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1950 02/09/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 3333 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63710
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1950 21/10/1950 10 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 07/03/1953 21/03/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 22142 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1955 10/12/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 22135 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1194
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4902
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
18/09/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
22/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3541    
02/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3710    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
13/07/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63710 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev