|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 10/03/1917 | 07/07/1917 | 120 days | General | Boiler number 1687 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/08/1919 | 08/11/1919 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1514 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1921 | 07/01/1922 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 279 (Diagram 15) Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1923 | 15/12/1923 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/10/1926 | 31/12/1926 | 84 days | General | Boiler number 1168 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6194 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1928 | 30/03/1929 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1960 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1931 | 10/10/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 929 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1934 | 02/06/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1177 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1937 | 30/01/1937 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1940 | 09/03/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1852 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1943 | 10/04/1943 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 863 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1945 | 20/10/1945 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3398 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/12/1947 | 17/01/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3308 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3710 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1950 | 02/09/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3333 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63710 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/10/1950 | 21/10/1950 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1953 | 21/03/1953 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22142 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1955 | 10/12/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22135 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1194 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4902 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
18/09/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
10/03/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1917. Dep: 07/07/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1687 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/08/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1919. Dep: 08/11/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1514 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/11/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1921. Dep: 07/01/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 279 (Diagram 15) Ross Pop |
||
13/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1923. Dep: 15/12/1923. | ||
09/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1926. Dep: 31/12/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1168 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6194 |
||
22/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1928. Dep: 30/03/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1960 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1931. Dep: 10/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 929 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1934. Dep: 02/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1177 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1937. Dep: 30/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
24/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1940. Dep: 09/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1852 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1943. Dep: 10/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 863 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3398 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3541 | ||
02/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3710 | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
20/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1947. Dep: 17/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3308 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3710 |
||
12/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1950. Dep: 02/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3333 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63710 |
||
12/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/10/1950. Dep: 21/10/1950. | ||
07/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1953. Dep: 21/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22142 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1955. Dep: 10/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22135 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/07/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63710 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |