|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 29/11/1919 | 28/02/1920 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1837 (Diagram ) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1921 | 23/09/1922 | 464 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/06/1924 | 02/08/1924 | 50 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6197 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/06/1927 | 01/10/1927 | 113 days | General | Boiler number 814 (Diagram ) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/07/1929 | 10/08/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1932 | 16/04/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1953 (Diagram ) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/05/1933 | 01/07/1933 | 50 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1935 | 14/12/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1150 (Diagram ) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/12/1938 | 07/01/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3359 (Diagram ) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1941 | 04/10/1941 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 1951 (Diagram ) Renumbered to WD 771 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1197 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4905 Diagram boiler fitted |
||
04/07/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/11/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1919. Dep: 28/02/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1837 (Diagram ) |
||
01/05/1920 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
17/06/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1921. Dep: 23/09/1922. | ||
14/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1924. Dep: 02/08/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6197 |
||
11/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1927. Dep: 01/10/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 814 (Diagram ) |
||
13/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1929. Dep: 10/08/1929. | ||
02/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1932. Dep: 16/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1953 (Diagram ) |
||
13/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/05/1933. Dep: 01/07/1933. | ||
30/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1935. Dep: 14/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1150 (Diagram ) |
||
24/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1938. Dep: 07/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3359 (Diagram ) |
||
22/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1941. Dep: 04/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1951 (Diagram ) Renumbered to WD 771 |
||
04/10/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 771 from Mexborough (MEX) |