|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/08/1918 | 12/10/1918 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 1432 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1920 | 19/01/1921 | 110 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1923 | 04/05/1923 | 91 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/02/1925 | 07/04/1925 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6199 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1928 | 28/03/1928 | 63 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/04/1930 | 24/06/1930 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 1939 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1932 | 28/01/1933 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 1399 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1936 | 05/06/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1939 | 18/03/1939 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 3277 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1942 | 25/07/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/11/1944 | 02/12/1944 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 3294 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1945 | 29/12/1945 | 45 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1947 | 07/04/1947 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1947) number 3722 |
||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1947 | 30/06/1947 | 35 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1949 | 19/03/1949 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 3428 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63722 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1950 | 23/12/1950 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 22145 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1950 | 02/01/1951 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1952 | 08/05/1952 | 3 days | Weighing | |||
Gorton Works | 09/02/1953 | 07/03/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 22131 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1953 | 06/06/1953 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1954 | 28/08/1954 | 81 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 04/02/1956 | 17/03/1956 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22176 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/08/1956 | 18/08/1956 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 17/12/1957 | 01/02/1958 | 47 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1959 | 06/01/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 22177 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1199 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4907 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
24/10/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
27/08/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1918. Dep: 12/10/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1432 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/10/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1920. Dep: 19/01/1921. | ||
03/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1923. Dep: 04/05/1923. | ||
20/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1925. Dep: 07/04/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6199 |
||
26/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1928. Dep: 28/03/1928. | ||
26/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1930. Dep: 24/06/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1939 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1932. Dep: 28/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1399 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1936. Dep: 05/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
29/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1939. Dep: 18/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3277 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1942. Dep: 25/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3294 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/11/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945. | ||
13/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
07/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3546 | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
13/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1947. Dep: 07/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1947) number 3722 |
||
27/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/05/1947. Dep: 30/06/1947. | ||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
12/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1949. Dep: 19/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3428 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63722 |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
01/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1950. Dep: 23/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22145 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/12/1950. Dep: 02/01/1951. | ||
06/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Weighing) - Arr: 06/05/1952. Dep: 08/05/1952. | ||
09/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1953. Dep: 07/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22131 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/06/1953. Dep: 06/06/1953. | ||
09/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/06/1954. Dep: 28/08/1954. | ||
29/08/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
09/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
04/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1956. Dep: 17/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22176 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1956. Dep: 18/08/1956. | ||
17/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/12/1957. Dep: 01/02/1958. | ||
01/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
29/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (41G) | ||
30/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1959. Dep: 06/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22177 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
28/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
24/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63722 from Langwith Junction (41J) |