|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 23/06/1917 | 25/08/1917 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1539 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1921 | 15/10/1921 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1939 (Diagram 15) Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1923 | 30/06/1923 | 99 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1925 | 14/03/1925 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1289 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6200 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1928 | 05/05/1928 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/05/1930 | 21/06/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1263 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1933 | 11/03/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1706 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/07/1936 | 11/07/1936 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3251 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1939 | 12/08/1939 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/10/1942 | 24/10/1942 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 859 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1944 | 11/11/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1946 | 14/09/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3373 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3547 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/12/1948 | 08/01/1949 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3260 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63723 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1951 | 08/09/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22212 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1953 | 26/09/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22151 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1955 | 22/01/1955 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1956 | 07/04/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22134 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1959 | 09/11/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1200 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4908 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
24/10/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
23/06/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1917. Dep: 25/08/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1539 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/10/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1921. Dep: 15/10/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1939 (Diagram 15) Ross Pop |
||
24/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1923. Dep: 30/06/1923. | ||
31/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1925. Dep: 14/03/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1289 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6200 |
||
24/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1928. Dep: 05/05/1928. | ||
24/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1930. Dep: 21/06/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1263 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1933. Dep: 11/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1706 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1936. Dep: 11/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3251 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1939. Dep: 12/08/1939. | ||
06/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1942. Dep: 24/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 859 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
12/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
24/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3373 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3547 |
||
23/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3723 | ||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
11/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1948. Dep: 08/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3260 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63723 |
||
08/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
18/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1951. Dep: 08/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22212 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1953. Dep: 26/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22151 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1955. Dep: 22/01/1955. | ||
29/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
03/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1956. Dep: 07/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22134 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/11/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63723 from Mexborough (41F) | ||
09/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 09/11/1959. Dep: 09/11/1959. |