Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 37 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 5594 Week
» 16739 Month
» 116524 Year
» 1781900 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1202 m/e 10/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6202   26/02/1927
War Dept. 739   19/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4910
To Service During 10/1912
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off Annesley (ANN)
Service Life 28 yrs, 11 mths , 20 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 739 and sent to Middle East via Bidston 15/10/41

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1912
MEX   Mexborough on 03/04/1915
GOR   Gorton on 07/05/1929
CLK   Colwick on 16/12/1933
ANN   Annesley on 15/02/1934
     Withdrawn on 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1468)
21/07/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1472)
20/10/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1438)
26/02/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1501)
01/08/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1949)
02/12/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1029)
07/03/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
07/03/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1953)
09/07/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3242)
09/03/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3388)
20/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3438)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 02/06/1917 21/07/1917 50 days General Boiler number 1472 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1921 09/04/1921 36 days General    
Gorton Works 14/07/1923 20/10/1923 99 days General Boiler number 1438 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1926 26/02/1927 134 days General Boiler number 1501 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6202
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1929 04/05/1929 29 days General    
Gorton Works 11/07/1931 01/08/1931 22 days General Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1933 02/12/1933 22 days General Boiler number 1029 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1936 07/03/1936 15 days General Boiler number 1953 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1938 09/07/1938 8 days General Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1940 09/03/1940 15 days General Boiler number 3388 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1941 20/09/1941 13 days General Boiler number 3438 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 739
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1202
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4910
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
03/04/1915 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
02/06/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1917. Dep: 21/07/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1472 (Diagram 15)
   
05/03/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1921. Dep: 09/04/1921.    
14/07/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1923. Dep: 20/10/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1438 (Diagram 15)
   
16/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1926. Dep: 26/02/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1501 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6202
   
06/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1929. Dep: 04/05/1929.    
07/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
11/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1931. Dep: 01/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15)
   
11/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1933. Dep: 02/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1029 (Diagram 15)
   
16/12/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
15/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
22/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1936. Dep: 07/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1953 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
02/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1938. Dep: 09/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 15)
   
24/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1940. Dep: 09/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3388 (Diagram 15)
   
08/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3438 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 739
   
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 739 from Annesley (ANN)    

prev prev