Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 541 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6152 Week
» 17198 Month
» 17198 Year
» 1682574 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1204 m/e 08/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6204   05/07/1924
War Dept. 737   14/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19860
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off Cambridge (CAM)
Service Life 29 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 737 and sent to Middle East via Bidston 14/10/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1912
IMM Immingham on 20/10/1922
MAR March on 05/03/1929
CAM Cambridge on 09/06/1932
   Withdrawn on 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1470)
30/06/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1469)
21/01/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1509)
05/07/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1451)
29/09/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1047)
18/10/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1108)
17/09/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1135)
03/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1283)
06/03/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1065)
08/07/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1020)
20/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3348)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 03/03/1917 30/06/1917 120 days General
Boiler number 1469 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/11/1921 21/01/1922 60 days General
Boiler number 1509 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1924 05/07/1924 50 days General
Boiler number 1451 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6204
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1926 30/10/1926 120 days General  
Gorton Works 30/06/1928 29/09/1928 92 days General
Boiler number 1047 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/10/1930 18/10/1930 15 days General
Boiler number 1108 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1932 17/09/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1135 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1935 03/08/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1283 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/02/1937 06/03/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1065 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1939 08/07/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1941 20/09/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 3348 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1204
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19860
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
20/10/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
05/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
09/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 6204 from Cambridge (CAM)    
14/10/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 737    

prev prev