|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1917 | 04/1917 | General | Boiler number 1452 (Diagram 15) |
|||
Gorton Works | 27/03/1920 | 22/05/1920 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/06/1922 | 30/09/1922 | 120 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/11/1924 | 07/02/1925 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6206 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/11/1926 | 15/01/1927 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1928 | 29/12/1928 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1269 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1930 | 06/12/1930 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1303 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1933 | 14/10/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1010 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1936 | 07/03/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1338 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1938 | 26/03/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1308 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1940 | 19/10/1940 | 15 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1942 | 02/01/1943 | 16 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/01/1945 | 20/01/1945 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1947 | 13/09/1947 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/05/1949 | 18/06/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3281 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63743 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1951 | 13/10/1951 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22218 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1953 | 02/01/1954 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22191 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1956 | 25/08/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22199 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/01/1959 | 31/01/1959 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22882 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1206 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19862 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
07/09/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grimsby (GRI) | ||
1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: ?/04/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1452 (Diagram 15) |
||
1920 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
27/03/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1920. Dep: 22/05/1920. | ||
03/06/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1922. Dep: 30/09/1922. | ||
24/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
08/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1924. Dep: 07/02/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6206 |
||
13/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1926. Dep: 15/01/1927. | ||
22/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1928. Dep: 29/12/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1269 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
22/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1930. Dep: 06/12/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1303 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1933. Dep: 14/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1010 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/02/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
22/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1936. Dep: 07/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1338 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
12/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1938. Dep: 26/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1308 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940. | ||
18/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1942. Dep: 02/01/1943. | ||
06/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1945. Dep: 20/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
01/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3553 | ||
02/03/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3743 | ||
30/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1947. Dep: 13/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
28/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1949. Dep: 18/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3281 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63743 |
||
20/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
28/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
29/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1951. Dep: 13/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22218 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1953. Dep: 02/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22191 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1956. Dep: 25/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22199 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1959. Dep: 31/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22882 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/06/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63743 from Gorton (9G) |